Wiley v. Five Below
Plaintiff: Willis Floyd Wiley
Defendant: Five Below
Case Number: 4:2015cv01798
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Frances H Stacy
Referring Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 02/17/2016. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4)
February 9, 2016 Filing 22 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #21 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
February 8, 2016 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Conference held on January 13, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Frances H. Stacy Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016., filed. (mahenry, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 20 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Magistrate Judge Frances Stacy for transcript of Pre-Trial Hearing held 1/13/2016 before Judge Frances Stacy. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (mmiller, 4). Ordinary Order forwarded electronically to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 1/27/2015. Estimated transcript completion date: 2/26/2015. Modified on 1/27/2016 (pcrawford, 4).
January 14, 2016 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER, filed. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(cvillegas, 7)
January 13, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/13/2016; Plaintiff stated in open court that he wants to Dismiss this case, and that he will file a Motion to Dismiss by 1/14/2016. Appearances:Willis Wiley - Pro Se; Dew Tipton for Five Below. Ashlee Cassman Grant.(Court Reporter: ERO)(Digital # 10:56 - 10:59)(ERO:M Miller), filed.(bwhite, 4)
January 4, 2016 Filing 18 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Five Below, filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
December 23, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, filed by Willis Floyd Wiley. Motions referred to Frances H Stacy. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (yhausmann, 6)
December 18, 2015 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Five Below served on 11/12/2015, answer due 12/3/2015, filed.(cvillegas, 7)
December 4, 2015 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Five Below, filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
December 4, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint Motions referred to Frances H Stacy. by Five Below, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Defendant Five Below Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Memorandum In Support Of Defendant Five Below Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Appendix Appendix of Authorities for Defendants Memorandum In Support of Defendant Five Below Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #5 Appendix A, #6 Appendix B, #7 Appendix C, #8 Appendix D, #9 Appendix E, #10 Appendix F, #11 Appendix G, #12 Appendix H, #13 Appendix I, #14 Appendix J, #15 Appendix K, #16 Appendix L, #17 Appendix M, #18 Appendix N, #19 Appendix O, #20 Appendix P, #21 Appendix Q, #22 Appendix R, #23 Appendix S, #24 Appendix T)(Grant, Ashlee)
November 24, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, #12 Amended Complaint Motions referred to Frances H Stacy. by Willis Floyd Wiley, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(smurdock, 4)
October 28, 2015 Filing 12 AMENDED Title 1 of the American With Disabilities Act (ADA) Violation Lawsuit against Five Below filed by Willis Floyd Wiley. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Willis Floyd Wiley.(mcodina, 7)
October 28, 2015 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Five Below. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: In person, filed.(bdaniel, 4)
October 19, 2015 Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff, filed. (mmapps, 4)
October 13, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 1/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for USM to serve summons; granting #7 Motion to reset conference; conference reset to 1/13/2016 @ 10 AM before Judge Stacy.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
October 9, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION for a new conference hearing dateMotions referred to Frances H Stacy. by Willis Floyd Wiley, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2015. (mmapps, 4)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
August 7, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION US Marshal Serve Summons by Willis Floyd Wiley, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(smurdock, 4)
August 7, 2015 Summons Issued as to Five Below. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: In person, filed.(smurdock, 4)
July 2, 2015 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Willis Floyd Wiley, filed.(szellers, 7)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2015 at 02:45 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(ltien, 4)
June 24, 2015 Filing 2 Notice to Pauper of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ltien, 4)
June 23, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Five Below (Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis granted on 6/23/2015 by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) filed by Willis Floyd Wiley. (ltien, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Five Below
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Below
Represented By: Ashlee Cassman Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Floyd Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?