Trident Circle, Inc. v. T&T Subsea, LLC
Plaintiff: Trident Circle, Inc.
Defendant: T&T Subsea, LLC and T & T Subsea, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00282
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order of USCA; Judgment issued as mandate 2/2/18 re: #96 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 17-20729. THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED as of Feb. 02, 2018, pursuant to appellant's motion, filed. (rnieto, 1)
December 29, 2017 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #96 Notice of Appeal to Gus Pappas & Susan Wilson. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 17-20729), filed.(dnoriega, 1)
December 29, 2017 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #96 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 17-20729, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
December 15, 2017 Filing 106 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by T&T Subsea, LLC. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Trial, September 19-21, 2017, Kenneth M. Hoyt. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin. This order form relates to the following: #96 Notice of Appeal, 86 Bench Trial,, 91 Bench Trial, 87 Bench Trial,,, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
December 13, 2017 Filing 105 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #103 Transcript - Appeal, #102 Transcript - Appeal,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
December 13, 2017 Filing 104 Notice of Non-Compliance. Appellant/Appellee has failed to: File exhibits previously returned to the parties. Parties notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
December 12, 2017 Filing 103 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Trial, Volume 3 of 3, Pages 411 - 464 held on 9-21-17 before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party: Plaintiff. This transcript relates to the following: #98 Appeal Transcript Request, #96 Notice of Appeal, #99 Appeal Transcript Request,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2018., filed. (bslavin, )
December 12, 2017 Filing 102 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Trial, Volume 2 of 3, Pages 211 - 410 held on 9-20-17 before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party: Plaintiff. This transcript relates to the following: #98 Appeal Transcript Request, #96 Notice of Appeal, #99 Appeal Transcript Request,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2018., filed. (bslavin, )
December 6, 2017 Filing 101 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #100 Transcript - Appeal,. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
December 5, 2017 Filing 100 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Trial, Volume 1 of 3, Pages 1 - 210 held on 9-19-17 before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party: Plaintiff. This transcript relates to the following: #98 Appeal Transcript Request, #96 Notice of Appeal, #99 Appeal Transcript Request,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018., filed. (bslavin, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 99 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Gus E. Pappas. This is to order a transcript of Trial, 9/19/2017-9/21/2017 before Kenneth M. Hoyt. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin. This order form relates to the following: #96 Notice of Appeal, 86 Bench Trial,, 91 Bench Trial, 87 Bench Trial,,, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
December 1, 2017 Filing 98 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Trident Circle, Inc.. This is to order a transcript of Trial on 9/19/17, 9/20/17 and 9/21/17 before Judge Hoyt. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin. This order form relates to the following: #96 Notice of Appeal, 86 Bench Trial,, 91 Bench Trial, 87 Bench Trial,,, filed. (Hilburn, Nicole)
November 30, 2017 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 17-20729 re: #96 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
November 20, 2017 Appeal Review Notes re: #96 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: CJA. The appeal filing fee has been paid. Pending the filing of exhibits previously withdrawn by the parties Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 3, filed.(jtabares, 1)
November 20, 2017 Filing 97 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #96 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): B. Slavin, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (jtabares, 1)
November 17, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #93 Memorandum and Order by Trident Circle, Inc. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-19222969), filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hilburn, Nicole)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. The parties shall withdraw from the Clerk their trial exhibits and shall maintain them for purposes of appeal. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 20, 2017 Filing 94 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on October 20, 2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court concludes that Trident should take nothing by its suit and further, that T&T is not entitled to be indemnified for its legal fees. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 22, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Deposition Testimony of David Marsh by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. (Hilburn, Nicole)
September 21, 2017 Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Third day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/21/2017. Defense evidence continues. Defense rests. Witnesses: 1)Charles Anthony Reynolds 2)Jim Elliott. The Court takes this matter under advisement. The parties have agreed to withdraw their trial exhibits after the Court rules in this matter. Appearances:Michael Hogue, Jim Elliott (Corp. Rep.). Thomas O Deen, Gus E Pappas, Nicole Marie Hilburn.(Court Reporter: B. Slavin), filed.(chorace)
September 21, 2017 Filing 90 Exhibit List by T & T Subsea, LLC(chorace)
September 21, 2017 Filing 89 Exhibit List by Trident Circle, Inc.(chorace)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File its Objections and Response to the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 20, 2017 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Second day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/20/2017. Plaintiff's evidence continues. Plaintiff rests. Defense evidence begins. Witnesses: 1)Soterio John "AKi" Platis 2)Yiannis Karampelas Ploumaritis 3)Jim Elliott 4)Charles Anthony Reynolds. Recessed until 09/21/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Appearances:Michael Hogue, Jim Elliott (Corp. Rep.), Interperter - Catherine Hathaway f/Yiannis Karampelas Ploumaritis, Thomas O Deen, Gus E Pappas, Nicole Marie Hilburn.(Court Reporter: B. Slavin), filed.(chorace)
September 19, 2017 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. First day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/19/2017. Pretrial matters discussed. Exhibits w/o objections are admitted. Witnesses sworn. Rule invoked. Plaintiff's evidence begins. Witnesses: 1)Bas Coppes 2)Soterio John "AKi" Platis. Recessed until 09/20/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Appearances:Michael Hogue, Jim Elliott (Corp. Rep.). Thomas O Deen, Susan D Noe Wilson, Gus E Pappas, Nicole Marie Hilburn.(Court Reporter: B. Slavin), filed.(chorace)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 18, 2017 Filing 84 OBJECTIONS to #82 Proposed Pretrial Order, Plaintiff, Trident Circle, Inc.'s Exhibit List, filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Noe Wilson, Susan)
September 18, 2017 Filing 83 OBJECTIONS to #79 Exhibit List , filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Hilburn, Nicole)
September 18, 2017 Filing 82 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Trident Circle, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit E-1, #7 Exhibit E-2, #8 Exhibit E-3, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Hilburn, Nicole)
September 18, 2017 Filing 81 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by T & T Subsea, LLC(Noe Wilson, Susan)
September 18, 2017 Filing 80 Witness List by T & T Subsea, LLC(Noe Wilson, Susan)
September 18, 2017 Filing 79 Exhibit List by T & T Subsea, LLC(Noe Wilson, Susan)
September 18, 2017 Filing 78 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law by T & T Subsea, LLC(Noe Wilson, Susan)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying #37 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying #35 Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 11, 2017 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Bas Coppes As Supplement to His Report, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hilburn, Nicole)
September 11, 2017 Filing 74 Expert Report of Bas Coppes by Trident Circle, Inc., filed.(Hilburn, Nicole)
September 10, 2017 Filing 73 Expert Report of Charles Reynolds by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed.(Deen, Thomas)
September 10, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE Of Completion and Filing of Deposition on Written Questions to Paxton Crew - The Crew Law Firm by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition on Written Questions to Paxton Crew - The Crew Law Firm)(Deen, Thomas)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER FOLLOWING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on September 6, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Appearances: Gus E. Pappas, Nicole Marie Hillburn, Thomas O. Deen, Susan D. Noe Wilson, (Court Reporter: B. Slavin. Bench trial. Pursuant to phone conference, this matter is set for bench trial September 19, at 9:00 a.m. Pretrial matters are due on or before September 18, by close of business. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2017; Bench Trial set for 9/19/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11A before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 5, 2017 Filing 70 REPLY in Support of #37 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Petition/Complaint, filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Hilburn, Nicole)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying #39 Defendant's Request for Production.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #19 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying #38 Motion to Extend Expert Witness Deadlines.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying #33 Motion for Leave to File An Amended Answer.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 5, 2017 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #35 Opposed MOTION for Continuance, filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Hilburn, Nicole)
August 30, 2017 Filing 63 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER re: #62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Pretrial Order, filed.(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 30, 2017 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Pretrial Order by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2017. (Hilburn, Nicole)
August 29, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of Intent to Reply to T&Ts Subsea, LLCs Response to Plaintiffs Opposed Motion for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Petition/Complaint and T&Ts Response to Plaintiffs Opposed Motion for Continuance. re: #54 Response in Opposition to Motion, #57 Response to Motion by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. (Hilburn, Nicole)
August 28, 2017 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to #33 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant, T & T Subsea, LLC's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition/Complaint and Original Counterclaim, filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Deen, Thomas)
August 28, 2017 Filing 59 Supplemental REPLY to Response to #38 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Designation of Expert Witnesses, filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A - Report of George Angelis)(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 27, 2017 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to #38 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Designation of Expert Witnesses, filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CV of George Angelis, #2 Exhibit 2- Report of Bijan Taghavi, #3 Exhibit 2A - Resume of Bijan Taghavi)(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 25, 2017 Filing 57 RESPONSE to #37 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Petition/Complaint filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noe Wilson, Susan)
August 24, 2017 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #39 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Documents filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Hilburn, Nicole)
August 24, 2017 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #33 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant, T & T Subsea, LLC's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition/Complaint and Original Counterclaim filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 24, 2017 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to #35 Opposed MOTION for Continuance, filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noe Wilson, Susan)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #31 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Bas Coppes.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 22, 2017 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to #38 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Designation of Expert Witnesses, filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deen, Thomas)
August 22, 2017 Filing 51 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Objections and Response to Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 19, 2017 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Deen, Thomas)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #40 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Objections and Reply to Response to its Motion for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #39 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Documents. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 18, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt, filed. (On "Meet-Me" Line) (chorace)
August 17, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to #31 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Plainitff's Expert Bas CoppesOpposed MOTION to Strike Bas Coppes' Report, filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Deen, Thomas)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #38 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Designation of Expert Witnesses. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #37 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Petition/Complaint. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #35 Opposed MOTION for Continuance. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #33 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant, T & T Subsea, LLC's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition/Complaint and Original Counterclaim. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 11, 2017 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to #31 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Plainitff's Expert Bas CoppesOpposed MOTION to Strike Bas Coppes' Report, filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C)(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 11, 2017 Filing 40 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plainitff's Objections and ResponseResponse by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deen, Thomas)
August 10, 2017 Filing 39 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Documents by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deen, Thomas)
August 8, 2017 Filing 38 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Designation of Expert Witnesses by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 8, 2017 Filing 37 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Petition/Complaint by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilburn, Nicole)
August 7, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Intent to File a Motion for Leave to Supplement its First Amended Original Petition/Complaint by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. (Hilburn, Nicole)
August 4, 2017 Filing 35 Opposed MOTION for Continuance by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/25/2017. (Hilburn, Nicole)
August 3, 2017 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Opposed Motion for Leave re: #33 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant, T & T Subsea, LLC's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition/Complaint and Original Counterclaim, filed.(Deen, Thomas)
August 3, 2017 Filing 33 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant, T & T Subsea, LLC's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition/Complaint and Original Counterclaim by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Deen, Thomas)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #31 Opposed MOTION to Exclude and Strike Plainitff's Expert Bas Coppes. Response to Motion due by 8/11/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
July 27, 2017 Filing 31 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Plainitff's Expert Bas Coppes( Motion Docket Date 8/17/2017.), Opposed MOTION to Strike Bas Coppes' Report by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deen, Thomas)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Joint Motion for Continuance. Docket Call set for 9/11/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11A before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
April 11, 2017 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Trial by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Continuance)(Deen, Thomas)
April 11, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., Renewed COUNTERCLAIM against Trident Circle, Inc. by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Deen, Thomas)
April 7, 2017 Filing 27 OBJECTIONS to #26 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails between counsel)(Hilburn, Nicole)
April 6, 2017 Filing 26 First REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Part 1 Reynolds Report, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Part 2 Reynolds Report)(Deen, Thomas)
April 5, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 2-B, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 3-A, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Hilburn, Nicole)
April 4, 2017 Filing 24 ANSWER to #18 Amended Answer, Counterclaim by Trident Circle, Inc., filed.(Hilburn, Nicole)
April 4, 2017 Filing 23 STIPULATION re: Answer to T&T Subsea, LLC's First Amended Answer and Original Counterclaim by Trident Circle, Inc., filed.(Hilburn, Nicole)
March 30, 2017 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against T & T Subsea, LLC filed by Trident Circle, Inc. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(rosaldana, 4)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rosaldana, 4)
March 28, 2017 Filing 20 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Petition/Complaint by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Petition/Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hilburn, Nicole)
March 15, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Noe Wilson, Susan)
March 13, 2017 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Trident Circle, Inc. by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. (gclair, 4)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 13, 2017 Filing 16 REPLY to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed by T & T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Noe Wilson, Susan)
March 9, 2017 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Original Counterclaim, filed by Trident Circle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hilburn, Nicole)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Original Counterclaim. Response to Motion due by 3/9/2017.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
February 22, 2017 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Original Counterclaim by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Deen, Thomas)
January 13, 2017 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
November 30, 2016 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilburn, Nicole)
October 14, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Jury Demand by Trident Circle, Inc., filed. (Hilburn, Nicole)
September 1, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. (Noe Wilson, Susan)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOLLOWING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on May 9, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Appearances: Gus E. Pappas, Thomas O. Deen. ETT: 16 hours. Jury trial. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 11/30/2016. Pltf Expert Report due by 11/30/2016. Deft Expert Witness List due by 1/15/2017. Deft Expert Report due by 1/15/2017. Discovery due by 3/15/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/15/2017. Docket Call set for 5/1/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11A before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Discovery may be extended by agreement of the parties without Court intervention. The dispositive motion deadline and docket call dates, however, may not be extended without leave of Court.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
May 6, 2016 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Trident Circle, Inc., filed.(Hilburn, Nicole)
May 5, 2016 Filing 6 Ex Parte INITIAL DISCLOSURES by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Deen, Thomas)
April 28, 2016 Filing 5 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed.(Deen, Thomas)
March 11, 2016 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Trident Circle, Inc., filed.(Hilburn, Nicole)
March 9, 2016 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by T & T Subsea, LLC, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 5/9/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
February 3, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th JDC of Harris County, TX, case number 201600934 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-16119116) filed by T&T Subsea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noe Wilson, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trident Circle, Inc. v. T&T Subsea, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trident Circle, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Marie Hilburn
Represented By: Gus E Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&T Subsea, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T & T Subsea, LLC
Represented By: Thomas O Deen
Represented By: Susan D Noe Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?