Luley v. Caterpillar, Inc.
Plaintiff: Luley and Robert P. Luley
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00318
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Granting #11 Stipulation of Dismissal. Case terminated on 4/27/2016. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
April 25, 2016 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Caterpillar, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wadsworth, Brian)
April 5, 2016 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Wadsworth, Brian)
March 28, 2016 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert P. Luley. (amireles, 2)
March 7, 2016 Filing 8 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on March 7, 2016. Mr. Luley will file a response to Caterpillar's motion to dismiss, (Docket Entry No. 3), by April 8, 2016. Caterpillar may file a reply of no more than 5 pages within 7 days of the response. The court will enter a scheduling and docket control order after resolving the motion to dismiss, if necessary. Appearances:Bob Luling-Pros Se Pltf (by phone) and Brian Wadsworth for Deft.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(leddins, 4)
February 22, 2016 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Caterpillar, Inc., filed.(Wadsworth, Brian)
February 22, 2016 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caterpillar, Inc., filed.(Wadsworth, Brian)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedure) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 18, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Caterpillar, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wadsworth, Brian)
February 18, 2016 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caterpillar, Inc., filed.(Wadsworth, Brian)
February 5, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Justice Court, Precinct 4, Place 2, Harris County, Texas, case number CV-42-C-05087528 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-16135726) filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Wadsworth, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luley v. Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Ashley Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Luley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?