ODonnell v. Harris County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Maranda Lynn ODonnell
Defendant: Harris County, Texas, Sheriff Ron Hickman, Eric Stewart Hagstette, Joseph Licata III, Ronald Nicholas, Blanca Estela Villagomez and Jill Wallace
Case Number: 4:2016cv01414
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER Granting 715 Letter of Agreement. The consent decree deadlines extended to September 21, 2020 ( Notice of Compliance due by 9/21/2020). (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 707 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered GRANTING 657 Joint MOTION for Approval of PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Consent Decree to follow. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER entered Regarding the appearances and procedures for the Fairness Hearing set for October 28. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered: The parties' joint motion for preliminary approval of the consent decree and settlement agreement and for approval of class notice, (Docket Entry No. 617), is granted. The court: (1) preliminarily approves the p roposed consent decree and settlement agreement (Docket Entry Nos. 617-1, 617-2); (2) approves the proposed notice (with minor changes) and the methods of distribution; and (3) directs the parties to issue the notice using those methods by September 9, 2019. The parties must move for final approval by September 27, 2019. Nonduplicative written objections must be filed by October 11, 2019. A final fairness hearing on the proposed consent decree and settlement agreement is set for October 21, 2019, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 11-B.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Misdemeanor Arrestees) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's report. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER regarding updated reporting requirements entered.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER and NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: On August 14, 2018, the Fifth Circuit issued a ruling staying four sections of the Revised Amended Preliminary Injunction, pending the merits appeal of that injunction. The court seeks input from the partie s about the current schedule and the impact of the pending appeal. The parties should submit a written statement no later than August 22, 2018 addressing the following issues: 1. whether the court can and should proceed with deciding the summary judgment motions while the current appeal is pending; and 2. whether the court can and should proceed with the permanent bench injunction trial while the current appeal is pending. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER entered regarding 463 MOTION for Clarification: The Sheriff asked the court to clarify whether, with the Fifth Circuit's temporary stay ofSections (7), (8), (9), and (16) of the Amended Preliminary Injunction Order, any misdemeanorar restees must be released by the Sheriff on an unsecured bond. The answer is no. The originalPreliminary Injunction Order will dissolve when the Amended Preliminary Injunction Order takeseffect on July 30, 2018. Sections (1)(6), (10)(15), and (17)(18) do not require the Sheriff torelease misdemeanor arrestees, either before a hearing and individual assessment or after 48 hoursif a hearing and individual assessment are not provided. The Amended Preliminary Injunction Orderdoes not, however, prohib it the Sheriff from releasing, or otherwise limit the Sheriffs authority torelease, misdemeanor arrestees as appropriate under the law or any other rule, custom, or practice.The court appreciates the Sheriff's commitment to ensuring timely compliance with thecourt's Amended Preliminary Injunction Order. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER entered :Regarding 457 MOTION for Clarification as to 427 Preliminary Injunction : (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 453 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD entered. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION entered. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered: Based on the Fifth Circuit rulings, the law, the evidence in the record, and the parties proposals and arguments, this court attaches an amended preliminary injunction order as a tentative ruling. The order is tentat ive so that the parties may review and comment. The comments are to be limited to substantive issues that are most significant. The parties must first confer in a cooperative effort to agree, if possible. The comments are due by Monday, June 25, 2018, by 12:00p.m. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER entered: The plaintiffs motion to continue is granted. (Docket Entry No. 389). The defendants cross-motion for stay of the preliminary injunction and entry of a modified injunction is denied. (Docket Entry No. 390). The status conference a nd written submission deadline will be continued until the Fifth Circuit decides the rehearing petitions and the parties confer on how to modify the injunction in light of those rulings and the prior ruling and order.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER entered DENYING 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Amend 54 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER entered: A hearing is set for Tuesday, January 23, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11B. The Hearing Officers who testified or who submitted affidavits in this court or to the Commission on Judicial Conduct and the Harris County Criminal Courts at Law Judge defendants are ordered to appear in person.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER entered GRANTING 362 MOTION for Clarification.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered DENYING Defts. 311 EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Main Document 327 replaced on 5/11/2017) (leddins, 4).
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER of CLARIFICATION entered regarding 316 MOTION for Clarification as to 304 Preliminary Injunction. The court denies the request for modification as unnecessary. The court appreciates the Sheriff's thoughtful requests and his commit ment to complying with the court's Order and to continue collaborative efforts to implement the County's planned reforms to the misdemeanor bail system. If further clarification is needed, the Sheriff must promptly notify the court and a conference will be held on May 12, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11-B.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER ON CONTINGENT MOTION TO STAY entered DENYING 252 MOTION to Stay Contingent Pending Appeal and Brief in Support. Motion is denied without prejudice. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered DENYING 131 MOTION for Reconsideration of 125 Memorandum and Opinion.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER entered regarding the discovery issues addressed at the last hearing held before this court. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered MOOTING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , DENYING 85 MOTION to Dismiss 54 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , MOOTING 25 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims< /i>,DENYING 80 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER YOUNGER ABSTENTION AND OTHER 12(B)(1) GROUNDS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER 12(B)(6),DENYING 120 MOTION to Strike 118 Supplement,, Defendants' Suppl emental Briefing on Motion to Dismiss, MOOTING 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,DENYING 84 Amended MOTION to Dismiss 54 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , DENYING 83 MOTION to Dismiss 54 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , DENYING 81 Sealed Event. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER entered: DENYING 58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Oppossed Motion for Consideration of Sheriff Hickman's Motion to Dismiss on Expedited Schedule Set Forth in August 26, 2016 Minute Entry. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER entered: regarding mediation issued raised by the court and setting response deadline to respond.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ODonnell v. Harris County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County, Texas
Represented By: Katharine Davenport David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Ron Hickman
Represented By: Katharine Davenport David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Stewart Hagstette
Represented By: Katharine Davenport David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Licata III
Represented By: Katharine Davenport David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Nicholas
Represented By: Katharine Davenport David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Estela Villagomez
Represented By: Katharine Davenport David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Wallace
Represented By: Katharine Davenport David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maranda Lynn ODonnell
Represented By: Rebecca Bernhardt
Represented By: Michael Gervais
Represented By: Alec Karakatsanis
Represented By: Susanne Ashley Pringle
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Lexie Giselle White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?