La'Tiejira v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paree La'Tiejira
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Kyle Anders and Defendants A, B, C
Case Number: 4:2016cv02574
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, mooting 33 Motion to Dismiss. ; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Case terminated on 8/7/2017.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins) Modified on 6/14/2017 (rhawkins, 4).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La'Tiejira v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paree La'Tiejira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants A, B, C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?