TOTAL E&P USA, Inc. v. Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.
Defendant: Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv02671
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Referring Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 11/11/2019 re: Document(s) Sent, filed. (jdav, 4)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Order of USCA re: #244 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 19-2071. It is ORDERED that the joint stipulation to view and obtain sealed documents is GRANTED, filed. (rnieto, 1)
August 19, 2019 Filing 259 USCA LETTER from the Fifth Circuit advising court reporter Fred E. Warner the 20% discount was implemented on July 31, 2019. As of today's date, the transcript has not been filed. If you do not comply with this request within 10 days, we will refer this matter to our court for appropriate action.(USCA No. 19-20282), filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
July 30, 2019 Filing 258 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel by Kat Kunz re: #49 Notice of Appearance by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Eskridge, Charles)
June 26, 2019 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #244 Notice of Appeal to Charles Robert Eskridge, III, Kyle D. Schonekas, Andrea V. Timpa, Joelle F. Evans, Taylor Paul Mouledoux, Paul Joseph Goodwine, Taylor Paige Gay, Carl Richard Hennies, and Sanford Ian Weisburst. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 19-20282), filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
June 26, 2019 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #244 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 19-20282, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
June 20, 2019 Filing 257 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #256 Transcript - Appeal, #254 Transcript - Appeal, #255 Transcript - Appeal, #252 Transcript - Appeal, #253 Transcript - Appeal,. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
June 19, 2019 Filing 256 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/20/19 before Judge Nancy F Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party: CHARLES R. ESKRIDGE, III. This transcript relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, #251 Appeal Transcript Request,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019., filed. (thudson, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 255 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/19/19 before Judge Nancy F Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party: CHARLES R. ESKRIDGE, III. This transcript relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, #250 Appeal Transcript Request,,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019., filed. (thudson, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 254 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re DOCKET CALL held on 2/12/19 before Judge Nancy F Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party: CHARLES R. ESKRIDGE, III. This transcript relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, #250 Appeal Transcript Request,,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019., filed. (thudson, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 253 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (IN CHAMBERS) held on 2/2/18 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party: CHARLES R. ESKRIDGE, III. This transcript relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, #250 Appeal Transcript Request,,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019., filed. (thudson, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 252 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/7/17 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party: CHARLES R. ESKRIDGE, III. This transcript relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, #250 Appeal Transcript Request,,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019., filed. (thudson, )
May 9, 2019 Appeal Remark re: #244 Notice of Appeal. Pending the filing of appeal transcripts re: #250 Telephone Status Conference on 12/7/17; Telephone Status Conference on 2/2/18 ; Docket Call on 2/12/19; and Pretrial Conference on 2/19/19 #251 Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/21/19(jtabares, 1) Modified on 5/9/2019 (jtabares, 1).
May 8, 2019 Filing 251 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Total E&P USA Inc./Charles Eskridge. This is to order a transcript of Final Pretrial Conference on 2/21/19 before Judge Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services. This order form relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, filed. (Eskridge, Charles) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on May 8 2019 Modified on 5/8/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4).
May 8, 2019 Filing 250 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Total E&P USA Inc./Charles Eskridge. This is to order a transcript of Telephone Status Conference on 12/7/17 before Judge Palermo; Telephone Status Conference on 2/2/18 before Judge Palermo; Docket Call on 2/12/19 before Judge Atlas; Pretrial Conference on 2/19/19 before Judge Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services. This order form relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, Telephone Conference, Telephone Conference, filed. (Eskridge, Charles) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on May 8 2019.Modified on 5/8/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4).
May 8, 2019 Filing 249 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Total E&P USA Inc./Charles Eskridge. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Status Conference on 9/11/18 before Judge Atlas. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services. This order form relates to the following: #244 Notice of Appeal, #185 Status Conference, #189 Transcript, filed. (Eskridge, Charles) Copies exist on the docket. Modified on 5/8/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4).
May 8, 2019 Filing 248 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Total E&P USA Inc./Charles Eskridge. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Pretrial Conference on 11/14/16 before Judge Atlas; Motion Hearing on 11/6/17 before Judge Palermo; Motion Hearing on 4/6/18 before Judge Palermo; Motion Hearing on 4/11/18 before Judge Palermo.. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services. This order form relates to the following: Motion Hearing, #244 Notice of Appeal, #37 Transcript, #147 Transcript, Motion Hearing, #149 Transcript, #77 Transcript,, filed. (Eskridge, Charles) Copies exist on the docket. Modified on 5/8/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4).
May 6, 2019 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 19-20282 re: #244 Notice of Appeal, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #246 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment and to Approve Supersedeas Bond. Execution of the Court's Final Judgment entered on 3/27/19 is stayed pending final disposition of the appeal.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
April 25, 2019 Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment and to Approve Supersedeas Bond by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
April 25, 2019 Filing 245 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #244 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): ERO, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (EdnitaPonce, 1)
April 25, 2019 Appeal Review Notes re: #244 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid. Hearings were held in the case - some transcripts were produced. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 10, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
April 24, 2019 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #243 Final Judgment by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-22305529), filed.(Eskridge, Charles)
March 27, 2019 Filing 243 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 3/27/2019(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 27, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Final Judgment by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTED #231 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #234 Corrected MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest. By March 27, 2019, counsel for Marubeni shall submit a proposed final judgment consistent with this Memorandum and Order for entry on March 29, 2019. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 13, 2019 Filing 240 REPLY to Response to #231 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #234 Corrected MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 12, 2019 Filing 239 RESPONSE in Opposition to #231 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #234 Corrected MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit B-1)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 11, 2019 Filing 238 REPLY in Support of #230 MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #235 Motion to Modify.Plaintiffs deadline for filing an omnibus response to the Motions isMarch 12, 2019, and Defendants deadline for filing its reply is March 15, 2019.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 8, 2019 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition to #231 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #234 Corrected MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kate Kaufmann Shih, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael W. Cougevan, #11 Exhibit B-1, #12 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 7, 2019 Filing 235 MOTION to Modify Consent Motion to Amend Deadlines for Interest and Attorneys Fee Briefing as to #234 Corrected MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, #231 MOTION for Attorney Fees by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 7, 2019 Filing 234 Corrected MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTED #232 Unopposed MOTION to Correct DENIED AS MOOT #230 MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, #230 MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 232 Unopposed MOTION to Correct #230 MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Corrected Motion for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, #3 Ex. 1 to Corrected Motion, #4 Ex. 2 to Corrected Motion)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 4, 2019 Filing 231 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2 (part 1 of 4), #4 Exhibit A-2 (part 2 of 4), #5 Exhibit A-2 (part 3 of 4), #6 Exhibit A-2 (part 4 of 4), #7 Exhibit A-3, #8 Exhibit A-4, #9 Exhibit A-5, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit B-1, #12 Exhibit B-2, #13 Exhibit)(Goodwine, Paul)
February 26, 2019 Filing 230 MOTION for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER In accordance with the Judgment [Doc. # 228] entered this day, it is hereby ORDERED that the following deadlines apply: Motion for Interest due February 26, 2019 Response due March 8, 2019 Reply due March 11, 2019 Motion for Attorneys Fees/Costs due March 4, 2019 Response due March 14, 2019 Reply due March 19, 2019(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) Modified on 2/21/2019 (sashabranner, 4).
February 21, 2019 Filing 228 JUDGMENT (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Final pretrial conference held Appearances: Kyle Schonekas, Paul Joseph Goodwine, Taylor P. Mouledoux, Charles R Eskridge, III, Jonathan Tyler Sink, Kate Kaufmann Shih. Ct Reporter: ERO. 1:45 p.m. Court recesses to allow the parties to confer.2:17 p.m. Court resumes: the parties are submitting agreed schedules as follows: (1) schedule for summary judgment motion on the amount of damages; (2) schedule for a motion for summary judgment on the issue of interest calculations; and (3) schedule on briefing on attorneys fees application.The parties agree that the trial setting is vacated. No trial will be held in this case. All other deadlines are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 226 RESPONSE in Opposition to #225 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Eskridge, Charles)
February 20, 2019 Filing 225 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Filing 224 Amended Proposed Pretrial Order by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.(Goodwine, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Filing 223 Amended Exhibit List by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.(Goodwine, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Filing 222 Amended Exhibit List by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.(Eskridge, Charles)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial conference held Appearances: Kyle Schonekas, Paul Joseph Goodwine, Taylor P. Mouledoux, Charles R Eskridge, III, Carl Richard Hennies. Ct Reporter: ERO. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Docket call held Appearances: Alicia Castro, Kate Sheen. Appearances: Kyle Schonekas, Joelle F. Evans, Paul Joseph Goodwine, Taylor Paige Gay, Taylor P. Mouledoux, Charles R Eskridge, III, Carl Richard Hennies. Ct Reporter: ERO. Amended exhibit list due by 12:00 p.m. on February 20, 2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas Jury Selection set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
January 31, 2019 Filing 219 REPLY in Support of #211 MOTION In Limine , filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Eskridge, Charles)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTED #210 MOTION to Open and Close Argument and Evidence at Trial (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
January 29, 2019 Filing 217 NOTICE of Objections and Counter-Designations to MOGUSs Deposition Designations (Dkt. 254-5) by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Total Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition)(Eskridge, Charles)( PER ATTORNEY FILED IN WRONG CASE) Modified on 1/30/2019 (mmapps, 4).
January 28, 2019 Filing 216 NOTICE of Objections to MOGUS's Exhibit List (Dkt. 212-3) by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Eskridge, Charles)
January 28, 2019 Filing 215 NOTICE of Objections to Total E&P USA, Inc.'s Trial Exhibits (Dkt. 212-2) by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goodwine, Paul)
January 28, 2019 Filing 214 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #213 Response in Opposition to Motion by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Goodwine, Paul)
January 28, 2019 Filing 213 RESPONSE in Opposition to #211 MOTION In Limine , filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (sealed), #3 Exhibit B (sealed), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Goodwine, Paul)
January 21, 2019 Filing 212 Proposed Pretrial Order by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CEPS Ownerhsip History, #2 Exhibit B - TOTAL's Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit C - MOGUS's Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit D - Total's Witness List, #5 Exhibit E - MOGUS's Witness List, #6 Exhibit F - Total's Trial Memo of Law, #7 Exhibit G - MOGUS Trial Memo of Law, #8 Exhibit H - Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, #9 Exhibit I - Total's Proposed Voir Dire Questions, #10 Exhibit J - MOGUS's Proposed Voir Dire Questions, #11 Exhibit K - Total Expert Witness Qualifications, #12 Exhibit L - MOGUS's Expert Witness Qualifications)(Eskridge, Charles)
January 21, 2019 Filing 211 MOTION In Limine by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/11/2019. (Eskridge, Charles)
January 9, 2019 Filing 210 MOTION to Open and Close Argument and Evidence at Trial by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Goodwine, Paul)
January 8, 2019 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Porter on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Porter, Christopher)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #207 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order ( Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2019., Objections to exhibits andwitnesses, responses to additional limine matters, and counter-designations ofdeposition testimony due by 1/28/2019, Docket Call set for 2/12/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas)(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
December 26, 2018 Filing 207 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER denying Motion for Clarification [Doc. # 184]. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(TDR, 4) Modified on 12/5/2018 (sashabranner, 4).
December 5, 2018 Filing 204 Docketed in error
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENIED #194 MOTION for Interlocutory Appeal as to #181 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, ( Jury Selection set for 2/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas, Opening statements and presentation of evidence set for 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas)(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
October 29, 2018 Filing 202 REPLY in Support of #193 Supplemental MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goodwine, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 201 REPLY in Support of #191 MOTION In Limine As to Issues Identified in TOTAL's Advisory Notice (Doc. 187), filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Goodwine, Paul)
October 19, 2018 Filing 200 REPLY in Support of #194 MOTION for Interlocutory Appeal as to #181 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Hennies, Carl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 199 RESPONSE in Opposition to #194 MOTION for Interlocutory Appeal as to #181 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
October 17, 2018 Filing 198 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
October 17, 2018 Filing 197 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
October 17, 2018 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition to #193 Supplemental MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Carl Hennies, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C (filed separately under seal), #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F (part 1), #9 Exhibit F (part 2), #10 Exhibit G (part 1), #11 Exhibit G (part 2), #12 Exhibit G (part 3), #13 Exhibit G (part 4), #14 Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit I, #16 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
October 17, 2018 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition to #191 MOTION In Limine As to Issues Identified in TOTAL's Advisory Notice (Doc. 187), filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Carl Hennies, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E (filed separately under seal), #8 Exhibit F (filed separately under seal), #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H (filed separately under seal), #11 Exhibit I (filed separately under seal), #12 Exhibit J (filed separately under seal), #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L (filed separately under seal), #15 Exhibit M (filed separately under seal), #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O (filed separately under seal), #18 Exhibit P (filed separately under seal), #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R (filed separately under seal), #21 Exhibit S (filed separately under seal), #22 Exhibit T (filed separately under seal), #23 Exhibit U (filed separately under seal), #24 Exhibit V (filed separately under seal), #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X (filed separately under seal), #27 Exhibit Y (filed separately under seal), #28 Exhibit Z (filed separately under seal), #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
October 2, 2018 Filing 194 MOTION for Interlocutory Appeal as to #181 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hennies, Carl)
October 2, 2018 Filing 193 Supplemental MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Goodwine, Paul)
October 2, 2018 Filing 192 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
October 2, 2018 Filing 191 MOTION In Limine As to Issues Identified in TOTAL's Advisory Notice (Doc. 187) by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit N-1 (sealed), #17 Exhibit N-2 (sealed), #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R)(Goodwine, Paul)
October 2, 2018 Filing 190 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #189 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) (hcarr, 4).
October 1, 2018 Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/11/18 before Judge Nancy F Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party CARL HENNIES Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2018., filed. (thudson, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 188 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Taylor P. Mouledoux/Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA) LLC for Transcript of Status Conference on 9/11/18 before Judge Atlas. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Goodwine, Paul). Copy Order electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 9/27/2018. Estimated completion date: 10/4/2018. Modified on 9/27/2018 (DesireeSillas, 4).
September 17, 2018 Filing 187 NOTICE (Advisory) of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc. Concerning Scope of Issues at Damages Trial by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Hennies, Carl)
September 17, 2018 Filing 186 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Total E&P USA, Inc./Carl Hennies for Transcript of Status Conference, Sept. 11, 2018, Judge Atlas. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Hennies, Carl) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 9/17/2018. Estimated completion date 10/1/2018. Modified on 9/17/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
September 14, 2018 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Clarification as to #182 Memorandum and Order by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
September 11, 2018 Filing 185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy F Atlas. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/11/2018. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/11/2019. Docket Call set for 2/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas Appearances:Phil Isenberg, Alicia Castro, Bryan Rome. Joelle F. Evans, Paul Joseph Goodwine, Taylor P. Mouledoux, Charles R Eskridge, III, Carl Richard Hennies.(ERO:yes), filed.(rguerrero, 4)
September 11, 2018 ***Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 2/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas (rguerrero, 4)
September 4, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference reset for 9/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas, filed. (sashabranner, 4)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTED #87 Sealed Event, #90 Sealed Event, #88 Sealed Event, #89 Sealed Event, #86 Sealed Event (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling Total's Objections [# 172], adopting Report and Recommendation [# 163], granting #92 MOGUS's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #97 Total's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Contract Claims; denying #98 Total's Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Prior and Complete Satisfaction of Decommissioning Obligations; granting #180 Motion to Strike Untimely Exhibits. Docket Call on 9/10/18 is converted to a status conference.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(TDR, 4)
August 20, 2018 Filing 180 MOTION to Strike #179 Reply, (Exhibits Only) by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
August 15, 2018 Filing 179 REPLY to #178 Response to the Report and Recommendation on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C)(Eskridge, Charles)
August 8, 2018 Filing 178 RESPONSE to #172 Objections to Report and Recommendations on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Goodwine, Paul)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying #96 Sealed Motion.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #170 Motion for Christopher Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo, ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (sashabranner, 4).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: Report and Recommendation on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment [Doc. # 172]. Responses due by 8/8/2018. Replies due by 8/15/2018(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 17, 2018 Filing 172 OBJECTIONS to #163 Report and Recommendations, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Eskridge, Charles)
July 17, 2018 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
July 16, 2018 Filing 170 MOTION for Christopher Landau to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. (Eskridge, Charles)
July 12, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor P. Gay on behalf of Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Gay, Taylor)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 5, 2018 Filing 167 REPLY to #161 Objections to Report and Recommendations (TOTAL's Reply in Support of Objections to the Report and Recommendation on Cross Motions Regarding Choice of Law), filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Eskridge, Charles)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 Motion for Extension of Time.the deadline to fileobjections to the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 163) is now July 17, 2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 2, 2018 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report & Recommendations on Cross Motions for Summary JudgmentMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
June 29, 2018 Filing 164 RESPONSE to #161 Objections to Report and Recommendations , filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Goodwine, Paul)
June 28, 2018 Filing 163 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding MOGUS' motion for partial summary judgment #92 , Total's motion for summary judgment on contract claims #97 , and Total's motion for summary judgment due to prior and complete satisfaction of decommissioning obligations #98 . The Court recommends that MOGUS' motion for partial summary judgment should be granted, Total's motion for summary judgment on contract claims should be denied, and Total's motion for summary judgment due to prior and complete satisfaction of decommissioning obligations should be granted in part. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (Palermo, J.)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER for Response to Objections by 6/29/2018. Replies due by 7/5/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(TDR, 4)
June 18, 2018 Filing 161 OBJECTIONS to #159 Report and Recommendations, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Eskridge, Charles)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 4, 2018 Filing 159 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #93 MOGUS' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Choice of Law, #99 Total's MOTION To Apply Louisiana Law Under OCSLA. Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2018(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(dpalermo, J.)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTED #157 Joint MOTION to Modify Deadline for Filing of Pretrial Order MOTION Modify Deadline for Filing of Pretrial Order ( Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2018., Docket Call set for 9/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas)(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
May 21, 2018 Filing 157 Joint MOTION to Modify Deadline for Filing of Pretrial Order ( Motion Docket Date 6/11/2018.), MOTION Modify Deadline for Filing of Pretrial OrderMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
May 17, 2018 Filing 156 Report Regarding Mediation by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Eskridge, Charles)
April 23, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE of Exhibits to Remain Under Seal re: #150 Order by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Substituted Ex. E-10)(Eskridge, Charles)
April 23, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE of Exhibits to Remain Under Seal re: #150 Order by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Mouledoux, Taylor)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Status Report due by 5/21/2018 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
April 19, 2018 Filing 152 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #149 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER The Parties have until 4/23/18, to notify the Court of filings to remain sealed.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
April 18, 2018 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 4/10/18 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party TAYLOR P. MOULEDOUX Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2018., filed. (thudson, )
April 17, 2018 Filing 151 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #147 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
April 17, 2018 Filing 148 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #147 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
April 16, 2018 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 4/6/18 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JUDGE DAVID HITTNER Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2018., filed. (thudson, )
April 11, 2018 Filing 146 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Total E&P USA, Inc. for Transcript of 4/6/18 and 4/10/18. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Hennies, Carl) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting Services 4/11/18. (COPY) Estimated completion 4/18/18. Modified on 4/11/2018 (TraceyConrad, 4).
April 11, 2018 Filing 145 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc./Taylor Mouledoux for Transcript of Motion Hearings on 4/6/18 and 4/10/18 before Judge Palermo. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Goodwine, Paul) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting Services 4/11/18. (COPY) Estimated completion 4/18/18. Modified on 4/11/2018 (TraceyConrad, 4).
April 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MOTION HEARING held on 4/10/2018. Parties discussed mediation within the next 3-4 weeks. Appearances:PJ Goodwine. Taylor P. Mouledoux, Charles R Eskridge, III, Karl S Stern, Kate Kaufmann Shih.(ERO:Yes), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
April 9, 2018 Filing 144 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Judge David Hittner for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 4/6/18 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (mperez, 1) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 4/10/2018. Estimated completion date 4/17/2018. Modified on 4/10/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 AMENDED ORDER TIME CHANGE ONLY Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
April 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MOTION HEARING held on 4/6/2018. Appearances: Taylor P. Mouledoux, Charles R Eskridge, III, Karl S Stern, Carl Richard Hennies, Kate Kaufmann Shih.(ERO:Yes), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying Total's Sealed Motion to Compel #115 ; and mooting MOGUS' Motion to Hold Total's Motion to Compel in Abeyance #136 . (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(dpalermo, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE OF DISCOVERY RULING IN RELATED CASE re: #115 Sealed Event by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goodwine, Paul)
April 4, 2018 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition to #136 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
April 3, 2018 Filing 138 Sealed Event, TEP USA's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Documents Regarding Valuation of Consideration Received by MOGUS under Bankruptcy Agreement, filed. Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.( cfelchak, 4)
March 30, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION to Hold in AbeyanceMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 30, 2018 Filing 135 Sealed Event, Marubeni Oil & Gas USA LLC's Opposition to Total E&P USA Inc's Motion to Compel, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
March 23, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE of letter to Court re oral argument scheduling by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Goodwine, Paul)
March 19, 2018 Filing 132 Total E&P USA Inc's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Due t Prior and Complete Satisfaction of Decommissioning Obligations, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 19, 2018 Filing 131 Total E&P USA INCs Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Contract Claims, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 19, 2018 Filing 130 REPLY in Support of #99 MOTION Apply Louisiana Law Under OCSLA, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 19, 2018 Filing 129 Sealed Event, Total E&P USA Inc's Reply in Support of Protective Motion to Strike Reciprocal Expert Reports and Testimony, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 19, 2018 Filing 128 REPLY in Support of #86 Sealed Event, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Goodwine, Paul)
March 19, 2018 Filing 127 Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Reply in further Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability with Respect to CEPS, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 19, 2018 Filing 126 Sealed Event, Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Reply in Further Support of its Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dallas Davis, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 19, 2018 Filing 125 REPLY in Support of #87 Sealed Event, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 19, 2018 Filing 124 REPLY in Support of #90 Sealed Event, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Goodwine, Paul)
March 19, 2018 Filing 123 REPLY in Support of #88 Sealed Event, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 19, 2018 Filing 122 REPLY in Support of #93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Choice of Law, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #119 Motion to Set Deadline for Filing of Reply Briefs.Deadline is March 19, 2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
March 13, 2018 Filing 120 Total E&P USA INC's Response in Opposition to Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability with Respect to CEPS, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 13, 2018 Filing 119 Joint MOTION to Set Reply Deadline.Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying #114 Request to file Motion to Seal. Please see Judge's Rule VIII(14). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying #111 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
March 9, 2018 Filing 115 Sealed Event, TEP USA's Motion to Compel Documents Regarding Valuation of Consideration Received by MOGUS Under Bankruptcy Agreement, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION to Seal its Motion to Compel Documents Regarding Consideration Received by MOGUS Under Bankruptcy AgreementMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 9, 2018 Filing 113 RESPONSE to #93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Choice of Law filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 9, 2018 Filing 112 Total E&P USA Inc's Response in Opposition to Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability with Respect to CEPS, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
March 9, 2018 Filing 110 Sealed Event, Total E&P USA Inc's Response in Opposition to Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of O. Kirk Wardlaw, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 109 Sealed Event, Total E&P USA Inc's Response in Opposition to Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimoy of Scott Sewell, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 108 Sealed Event, Total E&P USA Inc's Response in Opposition to Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gerald H Schiff, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 107 Sealed Event, Total E&P USA Inc's Response in Opposition to Marubeni Oil and Gas Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dallas Davis, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 106 Sealed Event, Total E&P USA Inc's Response in Opposition to Marubeni Oil and Gas Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions and Testimony of Michael W Cougevan, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 105 Sealed Event, Marubeni Oil & Gas USA LLC's Opposition to Total E&P USA Inc's Motion to Apply Louisiana Law Under OSCLA filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 104 Marubeni Oil and Gas USA LLC's Opposition to Total E&P USA Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Prior and Complete Satisfaction of Decommissioning Obligations. filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 9, 2018 Filing 102 Marubeni Oil & Gas USA LLC Opposition to Total E&P USA Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Contract Claims, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
March 9, 2018 Filing 101 RESPONSE to #96 Sealed Event filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
February 16, 2018 Filing 99 MOTION Apply Louisiana Law Under OCSLAMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
February 16, 2018 Filing 98 Total E&P USA Inc Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Prior and Complete Satisfaction of Decommissioning Obligations (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
February 16, 2018 Filing 97 Total E&P USA, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Contract Claims. (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
February 16, 2018 Filing 96 Sealed Event, Total E&P USA Inc's Protective Motion to Strike Reciprocal Expert Reports and Testimony filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cfelchak, 4).
February 16, 2018 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
February 16, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Choice of Law Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D)(Goodwine, Paul)
February 16, 2018 Filing 92 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability with Respect to CEPS (With attachments) Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4). (Attachment 27 replaced on 6/4/2018) (cfelchak, 4). Modified on 6/4/2018 (cfelchak, 4). (Attachment 27 replaced on 6/5/2018) (cfelchak, 4). (Attachment 26 replaced on 6/5/2018) (cfelchak, 4).
February 16, 2018 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
February 16, 2018 Filing 90 Sealed MARUBENI OIL & GAS (USA) LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF GERALD H. SCHIFF
February 16, 2018 Filing 89 Sealed Event MARUBENI OIL & GAS (USA) LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DALLAS DAVIS
February 16, 2018 Filing 88 Sealed MARUBENI OIL & GAS (USA) LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EXPERT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL W. COUGEVAN
February 16, 2018 Filing 87 Sealed MARUBENI OIL & GAS (USA) LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF SCOTT SEWELL
February 16, 2018 Filing 86 Sealed MARUBENI OIL & GAS (USA) LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF O. KIRK WARDLAW
February 7, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of letter to Judge Palermo re mediation deadline by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Eskridge, Charles)
February 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/2/2018. Appearances:Marcela Berdion, Elisia Castro, Curt Curkendahl. Joelle F. Evans, Taylor P. Mouledoux, Charles R Eskridge, III.(ERO:Yes), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 2/2/2018 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
January 24, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Jon Sink re: #68 Notice of Appearance by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Eskridge, Charles)
January 24, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Kaufmann ("Kate") Shih on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Shih, Kate)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. The Telephone Status Conference is CANCELLED, Deadlines terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 1/16/2018 at 03:00 PM Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
December 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/7/2017. Appearances:(ERO:Yes), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
November 16, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl R. Hennies on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Hennies, Carl)
November 15, 2017 Filing 78 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #77 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
November 14, 2017 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 11/6/17 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party ANDREW VAN HOOGENSTYN Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2018., filed. (thudson, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 76 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Andrew Hoogenstyn for Transcript of Hearing on Motions to Compel, 11/6/2017. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (dhansen, 4)Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 11/13/2017. Mr Hoogenstyn is deciding between expedited and daily. Modified on 11/13/2017 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 12/7/2017 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER regarding Status Conference held on 11/6/2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
November 6, 2017 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition to #70 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Michael Cougevan and Martindale Consutants, Inc., filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Castro, Alicia)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held denying #70 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Michael Cougevan and Martindale Consutants, Inc., mooting #69 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by KPMG, LLP. Appearances: Alicia Castro, Philip Eisenberg,. Appearances: Paul Joseph Goodwine. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(kmurphy, 4)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 1, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Michael Cougevan and Martindale Consutants, Inc. by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
November 1, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by KPMG, LLP by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
August 1, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Sink on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Sink, Jonathan)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTED #62 Opposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #24 Scheduling Order,, Expert Disclosure - Party with BOP dueOctober 27, 2017Expert Disclosure - Party without BOP due November 27, 2017Rebuttal Opinions (Existing Experts)December 11, 2017Discovery Deadline dueJanuary 19, 2018Motions DeadlineDueFebruary 16, 2018Mediation Deadline DueMarch 5, 2018Joint Pretrial Order DieMay 31, 2018Docket Call set(2:00 p.m.)June 14, 2018( Docket Call set for 6/14/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas)(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
May 30, 2017 Filing 66 REPLY in Support of #62 Opposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #24 Scheduling Order,,, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Eskridge, Charles)
May 25, 2017 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition to #62 Opposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #24 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #62 Opposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #24 Scheduling Order,, Responses due by 5/25/2017. Replies due by 5/30/2017(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
May 16, 2017 Filing 63 Other EXHIBITS re: #62 Opposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #24 Scheduling Order,, by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Eskridge, Charles)
May 16, 2017 Filing 62 Opposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #24 Scheduling Order,, by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
May 12, 2017 Filing 61 STIPULATION re: the Format of Production of Electronically Stored Information and Other Documents by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Eskridge, Charles)
May 10, 2017 Filing 60 Supplemental CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed.(Goodwine, Paul)
April 19, 2017 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Eskridge, Charles)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #57 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
April 7, 2017 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
April 4, 2017 Filing 56 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Eskridge, Charles)
April 4, 2017 Filing 55 First AMENDED ANSWER to by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Goodwine, Paul)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim [Doc. # 51]. Counsel for Defendant is directed to file the amended pleading as a separate docket entry.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaim [Doc. # 52]. Counsel for Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant is directed to file the amended pleading as a separate docket entry.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
April 3, 2017 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #2 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
April 3, 2017 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim, #2 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
March 21, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Stern on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Stern, Karl)
March 21, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Kunz on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Kunz, Katherine)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Michael W Mengis terminated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 15, 2017 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Charles Eskridge in place of Michael W. Mengis by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eskridge, Charles)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 27, 2017 Filing 45 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
February 16, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Occhipinti Thompson on behalf of Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Thompson, Holly)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
January 6, 2017 Filing 42 REPLY in Support of #32 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Goodwine, Paul)
January 5, 2017 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to #34 Corrected MOTION Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) to Deny or Defer Defendant Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Mengis, Michael)
December 30, 2016 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #34 Corrected MOTION Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) to Deny or Defer Defendant Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
December 30, 2016 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition to #32 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael W. Mengis, #2 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
December 27, 2016 Filing 38 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #37 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
December 23, 2016 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT re: INITIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/14/16 before Judge Nancy F Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party TAYLOR P. MOULEDOUX Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2017., filed. (thudson, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 36 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. for Transcript of Pretrial Conference on 11/14/16 before Judge Atlas. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Goodwine, Paul) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting Services on 12/22/2016. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 12/23/2016. (LinhthuDo, ).
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER entered. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any opposition to Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. # 32], and Defendant shall file any opposition to Plaintiffs Rule 56(d) Motion [Doc. # 34], by December 30, 2016. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
December 19, 2016 Filing 34 Corrected MOTION Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) to Deny or Defer Defendant Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael W. Mengis, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
December 19, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael W. Mengis, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mouledoux, Taylor)
December 16, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mouledoux, Taylor)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability under the CEPS Operating Agreement. Responses due by 1/20/2017..(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
December 14, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
December 8, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability under the CEPS Operating Agreement by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Goodwine, Paul)
November 17, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor P. Mouledoux on behalf of Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. (Mouledoux, Taylor)
November 15, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L. Friedman on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Friedman, Scott)
November 15, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip G. Eisenberg on behalf of TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. (Friedman, Scott)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial held Appearances: Philip Eisenberg, Taylor Mouledoux. Appearances: Paul Joseph Goodwine, Michael W Mengis. Ct Reporter: ERO. Docket control order to follow.Court is aware of the Rule 16 scheduling order entered by Magistrate Judge Smith workingwith Judge David Hittner, and endeavors to make our schedule very similar.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 8+ days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 4/3/2017 Pltf Expert Report due by 6/28/2017. Deft Expert Report due by 7/26/2017. Rebuttal Opinions From Existing Experts 8/11/2017 Discovery due by 9/15/2017. Mediation due by 10/31/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/13/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/13/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2018. Docket Call set for 1/25/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 7, 2016 Filing 22 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #2 Motion to Remand. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due 11/7/16, and initial pretrial and scheduling conference set for 11/14/16 at 2:00 p.m.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(TDR, 4)
October 14, 2016 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 11/7/2016. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Nancy F Atlas (TDR, 4)
October 5, 2016 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION to Remand, filed by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.. (Mengis, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #2 MOTION to Remand. Replies due by 10/5/2016.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
September 27, 2016 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Marubeni's Response in Opposition to TOTAL's Motion to Remand by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
September 23, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Remand, filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Spang, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment from TOTAL to ATP, #3 Exhibit C - TOTAL's Application for Installation of CEPS Flowline, #4 Proposed Order)(Goodwine, Paul)
September 22, 2016 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc. identifying Marubeni Corporation and Delzoil Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Goodwine, Paul)
September 21, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy F Atlas. Parties notified, filed. (gkelner, 4)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
September 20, 2016 Filing 12 Corrected CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael)
September 20, 2016 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael)
September 20, 2016 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc. identifying TOTAL S.A. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Mengis, Michael)
September 14, 2016 Filing 9 STIPULATION REGARDING STAY OF ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS, filed.(olindor, 4)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Paul J. Goodwine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
September 13, 2016 Filing 7 STIPULATION re: STAY OF ARBITRATON PROCEEDINGS by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael)
September 9, 2016 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against TOTAL E&P USA, Inc. by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed.(Goodwine, Paul)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/30/2016 at 03:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
September 6, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Paul J. Goodwine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2016. (mmarquez, 5)
September 6, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay All Arbitration Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand by TOTAL E&P USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Judicial District Court for Harris County, Texas, case number 2016-56288 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17183520) filed by Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOTAL E&P USA, Inc. v. Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Represented By: Kyle Schonekas
Represented By: Taylor P. Mouledoux
Represented By: Holly Occhipinti Thompson
Represented By: Joelle F. Evans
Represented By: Taylor Paige Gay
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Johnson
Represented By: Paul Joseph Goodwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOTAL E&P USA, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Heather Kunz
Represented By: Charles R Eskridge, III
Represented By: Christopher Darnell Porter
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Sink
Represented By: Christopher Landau
Represented By: Kate Kaufmann Shih
Represented By: Karl S Stern
Represented By: Carl Richard Hennies
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?