Doggett Company, LLC v. Thermo King Corporation
Plaintiff: Doggett Company, LLC
Defendant: Thermo King Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv02673
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Referring Judge: Stephen Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order of USCA; Judgment issued as mandate 1/5/2018 re: #101 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 17-20551. The appeal is dismissed as of January 5, 2018, pursuant to appellant's unopposed motion., filed.(bcampos, 1)
December 4, 2017 ***Delivery Confirmation; delivery date(s) Thu 11/30/2017 12:29 pm re: 113 Document(s) Sent, filed. (jdav, 4)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order of USCA re: #101 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 17-20551. It is Ordered that the joint motion of Doggett Company LLC and Thermo King Corporation to view and obtain all sealed documents is Granted, filed.(scastillo, 1)
October 27, 2017 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #101 Notice of Appeal to Stephen Crain, Christopher Dodson, Ryan Myers, Jeffrey Oldham, Peng Shu, and Gregory Ulmer. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 17-20551), filed.(scastillo, 1)
October 27, 2017 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #101 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 17-20551, filed.(scastillo, 1)
October 23, 2017 Filing 111 Sealed Event, filed.
October 3, 2017 Filing 110 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #109 Transcript - Appeal,. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
October 2, 2017 Filing 109 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Discovery Motions held on April 19, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party: Glen Shu. This transcript relates to the following: #103 Appeal Transcript Request,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
October 2, 2017 Filing 108 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #106 Transcript - Appeal, #105 Transcript, #107 Transcript - Appeal,. Party notified, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
October 1, 2017 Filing 107 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Motion for Summary Judgment held on November 10, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party: Christopher L. Dodson. This transcript relates to the following: #101 Notice of Appeal, #104 Appeal Transcript Request,,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
October 1, 2017 Filing 106 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Motion for Summary Judgment held on June 29, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party: Christopher L. Dodson. This transcript relates to the following: #104 Appeal Transcript Request,,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
October 1, 2017 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion for Summary Judgment held on November 10, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Christopher L. Dodson Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
September 12, 2017 *** Pending the filing of appeal transcripts re: #103 , #104 , filed. (jtabares, 1)
September 11, 2017 Filing 104 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Doggett Co./Dodson. This is to order a transcript of Scheduling Conference on 11/10/2016; Motion for Summary Judgment on 06/29/2017 before Judge Stephen Wm. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas. This order form relates to the following: 92 Motion Hearing, #101 Notice of Appeal, 22 Scheduling Conference,, filed.(Dodson, Christopher) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas 9/12/17. Estimated completion date 10/12/17. Modified on 9/12/2017 (tconrad, 4).
September 11, 2017 Filing 103 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Doggett/Dodson. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Discovery Motion on 04/19/2017 before Judge Stephen Wm. Smith. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas. This order form relates to the following: #54 Transcript, #101 Notice of Appeal, 47 Motion Hearing,, filed.(Dodson, Christopher)
September 8, 2017 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 17-20551 re: #101 Notice of Appeal, filed. (rnieto, 1)
August 31, 2017 Appeal Review Notes re: #101 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 2, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
August 31, 2017 Filing 102 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #101 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): ERO, filed. (Attachments: #1 NOA, #2 Final Judgmgent, #3 Opinion and Order, #4 Docket) (dnoriega, 1)
August 30, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by Doggett Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-18854842), filed. (Moss, William)
August 1, 2017 Filing 100 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 8/1/2017(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPINION AND ORDER granting #50 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying #66 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot #67 MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Hearing (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
July 31, 2017 Filing 98 Report For the Court's July 11 Order (Dkt. 97) by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 94 A - redacted Bayley expert report, #2 Exhibit 94 B - redacted Bayley supplemental expert report, #3 Exhibit 94 C - redacted Bayley deposition, #4 Exhibit 94 D - redacted Nagorzanski report, #5 Exhibit 96 redacted Bayley depo)(Dodson, Christopher)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to File; granting #95 Motion for Leave to File. Submissions due 8/1/2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
July 3, 2017 Filing 96 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
July 3, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File to File Under Seal its Third Evidentiary Supplement in Support of its Response to Defendant Thermo King Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
June 30, 2017 Filing 94 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 30, 2017 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Motion and Exhibits Under Seal by Thermo King Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2017. (Shu, Pengcheng)
June 29, 2017 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith. MOTION HEARING held on 6/29/2017 ; re: #50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion taken under advisement. Appearances: Stephen Burton Crain, Christopher Lee Dodson, Gregory Clayton Ulmer, Pengcheng Glen Shu.(ERO:L. Webster), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
June 26, 2017 Filing 91 Report For The Court's June 6 Order (DKT. 83) by Doggett Company, LLC, filed.(Moss, William)
June 26, 2017 Filing 90 Corrected SUPPLEMENT to #76 Sealed Event by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 43, #3 Exhibit 44, #4 Exhibit 45, #5 Exhibit 46, #6 Exhibit 47, #7 Exhibit 48)(Moss, William)
June 26, 2017 Filing 89 Corrected REPLY In Support Of Its Partial Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 43)(Moss, William)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER conditionally granting #86 MOTION for Leave to File its Evidentiary Supplement Under Seal (Submission Date 6/30/2017)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
June 20, 2017 Filing 87 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 20, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File its Evidentiary Supplement Under Seal by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
June 19, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Setting as to #50 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
June 16, 2017 Filing 84 SURREPLY to #67 MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Hearing, filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Shu, Pengcheng)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Public Docket Redacted Versions to be file within 21 days of entry of this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
June 6, 2017 Filing 82 Report For the Court's May 16 ORDER (Dkt. 70) by Doggett Company, LLC, filed.(Dodson, Christopher)
June 6, 2017 Filing 81 Corrected RESPONSE to #66 Sealed Event redacted, filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (seal cover only), #3 Exhibit 3 (seal cover only), #4 Exhibit 4 (seal cover only), #5 Exhibit 5 (seal cover only), #6 Exhibit 6 (seal cover only), #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 redacted, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12 (seal cover only), #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16 redacted, #17 Exhibit 17 (seal cover only), #18 Exhibit 18 redacted, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 redacted, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30 (seal cover only), #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38 (seal cover only), #39 Exhibit 39 (seal cover only), #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41)(Dodson, Christopher)
June 5, 2017 Filing 80 RESPONSE to #79 MOTION to Strike #71 Reply in Support of Motion filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shu, Pengcheng)
June 1, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION to Strike #71 Reply in Support of Motion by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
June 1, 2017 Filing 78 REPLY to #68 MOTION to Strike #50 Sealed Event Thermo King's Summary Judgment Evidence , filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Dodson, Christopher)
June 1, 2017 Filing 77 REPLY in Support of #67 MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Hearing, filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Dodson, Christopher)
June 1, 2017 Filing 76 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 1, 2017 Filing 75 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 1, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
May 25, 2017 Filing 73 RESPONSE to #68 MOTION to Strike #50 Sealed Event Thermo King's Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shu, Pengcheng)
May 25, 2017 Filing 72 RESPONSE to #67 MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Hearing filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shu, Pengcheng)
May 25, 2017 Filing 71 REPLY in Support of #50 Sealed Event, filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Proposed Order Granting Thermo King's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Shu, Pengcheng)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff to file redacted version of #66 Sealed Event within 21 days of entry of this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
May 16, 2017 Filing 69 Sealed Event, filed.
May 16, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION to Strike #50 Sealed Event Thermo King's Summary Judgment Evidence by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Doggett's Objections and Motion to Strike Thermo King Summary Judgment Evidence)(Dodson, Christopher)
May 16, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Hearing by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Doggett's Response to TK MSJ and Mt to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing)(Dodson, Christopher)
May 15, 2017 Filing 66 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 15, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Motion and Exhibits Under Seal by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Doggett Motion for Leave to File Its Motion and Exhibits Under Seal)(Dodson, Christopher)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER regarding #53 Motion for Clarification.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Amend Protective Order.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
May 9, 2017 Filing 62 Report for the Court's April 25 Order (DKT. 52) by Thermo King Corporation, filed.(Shu, Pengcheng)
May 9, 2017 Filing 61 Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment as redacted by Thermo King Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5, #9 Exhibit C-6, #10 Exhibit C-7, #11 Exhibit C-8, #12 Exhibit C-9, #13 Exhibit C-10, #14 Exhibit C-11, #15 Exhibit C-12, #16 Exhibit C-13, #17 Exhibit D, #18 Exhibit E, #19 Exhibit F, #20 Exhibit G, #21 Exhibit H, #22 Exhibit I, #23 Exhibit J, #24 Exhibit K, #25 Exhibit L, #26 Exhibit M, #27 Exhibit N, #28 Exhibit O, #29 Exhibit P, #30 Exhibit Q)(Shu, Pengcheng)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #50 Sealed Event. Responses due by 5/15/2015..(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
May 5, 2017 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Doggett Company, LLC's Deadline to Respond to Thermo King's Motion for Summary Judgment by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Doggett Company, LLC's Deadline to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Dodson, Christopher)
May 5, 2017 Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Amend #26 Protective Order by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Amended Protective Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
May 4, 2017 Filing 57 REPLY in Support of #53 MOTION for Clarification as to #41 MOTION to Compel Documents from Plaintiff, #49 Order,, filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Dodson, Christopher)
May 3, 2017 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #53 MOTION for Clarification as to #41 MOTION to Compel Documents from Plaintiff, #49 Order, filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shu, Pengcheng)
May 1, 2017 Filing 55 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #54 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
April 30, 2017 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT re: Discovery Motions held on April 19, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Glen Shu Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017., filed. (mahenry, )
April 27, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION for Clarification as to #41 MOTION to Compel Documents from Plaintiff, #49 Order, by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 MOTION for Leave to File Motion and Exhibits Under Seal.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
April 21, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Motion and Exhibits Under Seal by Thermo King Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2017. (Shu, Pengcheng)
April 21, 2017 Filing 50 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting in part, denying in part #40 MOTION to Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, #41 MOTION to Compel Documents from Plaintiff. Parties are to produce the compelling information within 14 days of entry of this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
April 20, 2017 Filing 48 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thermo King Corporation/Glen Shu for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 4/19/17 before Judge Smith. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Shu, Pengcheng) Electronically forwarded to JTT 4/20/2017. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 5/4/2017. (jguajardo, 4).
April 19, 2017 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith. MOTION HEARING held on 4/19/2017 ; re: #40 MOTION to Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, #41 MOTION to Compel Documents from Plaintiff. Motions taken under advisement. Appearances: Ryan C Myers, Christopher Lee Dodson, Jordan Alana Sinclair, Pengcheng Glen Shu.(ERO:M. Balboa), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
April 17, 2017 Filing 46 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 13, 2017 Filing 45 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 13, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Setting as to #40 MOTION to Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, #41 MOTION to Compel Documents from Plaintiff. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
April 4, 2017 Filing 43 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 30, 2017 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION to Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Proposed Order)(Sinclair, Jordan)
March 24, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION to Compel Documents from Plaintiff by Thermo King Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Shu, Pengcheng)
March 10, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION to Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Doggett RFP, #2 Exhibit 2 Doggett ROGS, #3 Exhibit 3 TK obj to rfp, #4 Exhibit 4 TK obj to rogs, #5 Exhibit 5 Ltr to TK, #6 Exhibit 6 Ltr from TK, #7 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
February 13, 2017 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thermo King Corporation, filed.(Sinclair, Jordan)
February 13, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan A. Sinclair on behalf of Thermo King Corporation, filed. (Sinclair, Jordan)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
January 17, 2017 Filing 36 REPLY in Support of #32 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Crain, Stephen)
January 10, 2017 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Shu, Pengcheng)
January 9, 2017 Filing 34 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shu, Pengcheng)
January 6, 2017 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #18 Surreply to Motion by Doggett Company, LLC, filed.(Dodson, Christopher)
January 6, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #19 MOTION Request for Preliminary-Injunction Hearing and/or Opposed Motion for Expedited Trial Setting ( Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/15/2017.)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 1/9/2017 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 2/1/2017. Deft Expert Witness List due by 3/3/2017. Discovery due by 6/16/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/1/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/1/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2017. Jury Selection set for 7/31/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith Jury Trial set for 7/31/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by All Parties and ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
December 29, 2016 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Modify as to #23 Scheduling Order, by Thermo King Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shu, Pengcheng)
December 29, 2016 Filing 27 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Thermo King Corporation, filed.(Shu, Pengcheng)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
December 5, 2016 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Protective Order)(Crain, Stephen)
November 16, 2016 Filing 24 RETURN of Service Executed as to Thermo King Corporation on 09/01/2016 re: Citation and Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Temporary Injunction and Notice of Oral Hearing, filed.(Moss, William)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: November/December 2017. ETT: 4 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2017 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2017. Deft Expert Witness List due by 4/3/2017. Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/1/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/1/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/27/2017.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
November 10, 2016 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen Wm Smith. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/10/2016. Scheduling order issued. Appearances: William Andrew Moss, Stephen Burton Crain, Gregory Clayton Ulmer, Pengcheng Glen Shu.(ERO:S. Arnow), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
November 1, 2016 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION Request for Preliminary-Injunction Hearing and/or Opposed Motion for Expedited Trial Setting, filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Shu, Pengcheng)
October 31, 2016 Filing 20 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Doggett Company, LLC, filed.(Crain, Stephen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION Request for Preliminary-Injunction Hearing and/or Opposed Motion for Expedited Trial Setting by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2016. (Crain, Stephen)
October 17, 2016 Filing 18 SURREPLY to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Crain, Stephen)
October 13, 2016 Filing 17 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Shu, Pengcheng)
October 7, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Christopher)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Expedite Discovery.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 22, 2016 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Thermo King Corporation, filed.(Shu, Pengcheng)
September 22, 2016 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Doggett Company, LLC, filed.(Dodson, Christopher)
September 19, 2016 Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Expedite for Discovery, filed by Doggett Company, LLC. (Dodson, Christopher)
September 16, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C. Ulmer on behalf of Thermo King Corporation, filed. (Ulmer, Gregory)
September 16, 2016 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Thermo King Corporation, filed.(Shu, Pengcheng)
September 16, 2016 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Expedite for Discovery filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Shu, Pengcheng)
September 16, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thermo King Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shu, Pengcheng)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Defendant may file a response to the Motion to Expedite Discovery on or before close of business on Friday, September 16, 2016. Failure to respond will be deemed as non-opposition to the motion.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 8, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C. Myers on behalf of Doggett Company, LLC, filed. (Myers, Ryan)
September 8, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Moss on behalf of Doggett Company, LLC, filed. (Moss, William)
September 8, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite for Discovery by Doggett Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - requests for production, #2 Exhibit B - deposition notices, #3 Proposed Order)(Crain, Stephen)
September 8, 2016 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION against Thermo King Corporation filed by Doggett Company, LLC. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Thermo King Corporation.(Crain, Stephen)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2016-58392 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17184021) filed by Thermo King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Shu, Pengcheng)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doggett Company, LLC v. Thermo King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doggett Company, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Burton Crain
Represented By: Ryan C Myers
Represented By: William Andrew Moss
Represented By: Christopher Lee Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo King Corporation
Represented By: Pengcheng Glen Shu
Represented By: Gregory Clayton Ulmer
Represented By: Jordan Alana Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?