Ling v. Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ling and Jianhua Ling
Defendant: Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv02961
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4072
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #20 Stipulation of Dismissal (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 15, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aguda, Joseph)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 1/11/2018 (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
June 5, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of attorney substitution by Texas Farmers Insurance Company. Attorney Joseph J. Aguda, Jr. added. Attorney John Dennis Carter terminated, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aguda, Joseph)
April 28, 2017 Filing 17 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Jianhua Ling, filed.(Michaels, Kevin)
April 20, 2017 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
March 28, 2017 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Texas Farmers Insurance Company filed by Jianhua Ling.(jdav, 4) (Main Document 15 replaced on 4/3/2017) (jdav, 4).
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File first amended complaint.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 24, 2017 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Jianhua Ling, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Michaels, Kevin)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2017 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 5/1/2017. Pltf Expert Report due by 5/1/2017. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2017. Deft Expert Report due by 6/1/2017. Discovery due by 12/1/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/9/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/9/2018. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2018. Docket Call set for 3/23/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Melinda Harmon. Trial Term by 3/26/2018(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
March 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2017; docket control Order to follow. Appearances: Kevin Richard Michaels, Bradley K Jones.(Court Reporter: ERO)(Digital # 10:33 - 10:38)(ERO:L Do), filed.(bwhite, 4)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL granting #6 MOTION to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
January 18, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
January 9, 2017 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 12, 2016 Filing 8 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Jianhua Ling, filed.(Michaels, Kevin)
November 9, 2016 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jianhua Ling, filed.(Michaels, Kevin)
October 11, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Bradley)
October 6, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Carter on behalf of Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. (Carter, John)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
October 5, 2016 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
October 3, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 164th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2016-45494 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17323639) filed by TEXAS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D)(Jones, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ling v. Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianhua Ling
Represented By: Kevin Richard Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Represented By: John Dennis Carter
Represented By: Joseph J Aguda, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?