National Coalition for Men et al v. Selective Service System et al

Plaintiff: National Coalition for Men and James Lesmeister
Defendant: Selective Service System, Lawrence G Romo and DOES
Case Number: 4:2016cv03362
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 90 Opposed MOTION for Relief from Judgment, DENYING 91 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment Points & Authorities.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment , DENYING 80 MOTION to Stay ProceedingsCross MOTION for Summary Judgment , DENYING 60 Plaintiff's request for injunction. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINIONAND ORDER GRANTING 57 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, DENYING MOTION for leave to transfer venue.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Coalition for Men et al v. Selective Service System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Coalition for Men
Represented By: Marc Etienne Angelucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lesmeister
Represented By: Marc Etienne Angelucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Service System
Represented By: Bryan R Diederich
Represented By: Lynn Yuhee Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence G Romo
Represented By: Bryan R Diederich
Represented By: Lynn Yuhee Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?