St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund v. Southwestern Energy Company et al
Plaintiff: St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Terry L. Rathert, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Comerica Securities, Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, John D. Gass, Steven L Mueller, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., RBS Securities Inc., BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Catherine A. Kehr, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BBVA Securities Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Craig Owens, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, Alan H. Stevens, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Kenneth R. Mourton, Josh C Anders, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Fifth Third Securities, Inc. and Greg D. Kerley
Case Number: 4:2016cv03569
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Referring Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2018 ***Delivery Confirmation; delivery date(s) Thu 4/12/2018 10:13 am, signed for by Q. Strayhan re: 51 Document(s) Sent,, filed. (jdav, 4)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Unopposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND REMAND; the Clerk is directed to take all necessary action to effectuate the remand ofthe above-referenced matter to the (61st) Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
April 10, 2018 Filing 49 PROPOSED ORDER re: #48 Unopposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND REMAND, filed.(Bilek, Thomas)
March 30, 2018 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND REMAND by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bilek, Thomas)
January 31, 2018 Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE re: #46 Letter of Agreement. Parties notified., filed. (ledwards, 4)
January 31, 2018 Filing 46 LETTER OF AGREEMENT re: Request to Continue Status Conference After Supreme Court Ruling by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed.(Bilek, Thomas)
January 31, 2018 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/11/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett (ledwards, 4)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING SUPREME COURT'S DISPOSITION OF RELATED PETITION FOR CERTIORARI, DENYING #21 MOTION to Remand ( Status Conference set for 2/2/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett)(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
July 31, 2017 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #43 Notice (Other), #42 Notice (Other), #41 Notice (Other) of New Authority, filed by Josh C Anders, BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reed, Noelle)
July 24, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY (THIRD) by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bilek, Thomas)
July 20, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY (SECOND) by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bilek, Thomas)
July 5, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bilek, Thomas)
June 27, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE Regarding Granting of Petition for Writ of Certiorari in Cyan re: #15 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING SUPREME COURT'S DISPOSITION OF RELATED PETITION FOR CERTIORARI by Josh C Anders, BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reed, Noelle)
June 12, 2017 Filing 39 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICES REGARDING CYAN WRIT OF CERTIORARI, filed by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund. (Bilek, Thomas)
June 9, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE Regarding Petition for Writ of Certiorari in Cyan by Josh C Anders, BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, filed. (Reed, Noelle)
May 26, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing of Acting Solicitor General's Amicus Brief in Cyan Supreme Court Petition for Writ of Certiorari by Josh C Anders, BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reed, Noelle)
May 19, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. MOTION HEARING held on 5/19/2017 ; Motion-related deadline set re: #21 MOTION to Remand. Case STAYED until Motion to Remand ruled on. Appearances:Wallace Hampton. Ellen B Sessions, Noelle M Reed, Thomas E Bilek, Thomas Livezey Laughlin, Geoffrey M Johnson.(Court Reporter: M. Malone), filed.(ledwards, 4)
May 10, 2017 Filing 36 STIPULATION by Josh C Anders, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Geoffrey M. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
May 3, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2017. (Bilek, Thomas)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Continuance. It is ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference previously set for May 19, 2017, and any associated obligations under Rule 26, are CONTINUED until after the Court has issued an order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #21 . The Court will conduct the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand on May 19, 2017, as currently scheduled. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
April 26, 2017 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Josh C Anders, BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle)
April 10, 2017 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Josh C Anders served on 3/31/2017, answer due 5/30/2017, filed.(Bilek, Thomas)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Hearing Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 24, 2017 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re: #21 MOTION to Remand by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Bilek, Thomas)
March 21, 2017 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Josh C Anders sent on 03/21/2017 by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Waiver form)(Bilek, Thomas)
March 17, 2017 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Josh C Anders sent on 03/17/2017 by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(Bilek, Thomas)
March 6, 2017 Filing 26 REPLY in Support of #21 MOTION to Remand, filed by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bilek, Thomas)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Continuance. Initial Conference reset for 5/19/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
February 22, 2017 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle)
February 14, 2017 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Remand, filed by BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Reed, Noelle)
January 17, 2017 Filing 22 REPLY to #20 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay, filed by BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Reed, Noelle)
January 13, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Laughlin, Thomas)
January 9, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING SUPREME COURT'S DISPOSITION OF RELATED PETITION FOR CERTIORARI, filed by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund. (Bilek, Thomas)
December 29, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John D. Gass, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, Vello A. Kuuskraa, Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, Elliott Pew, Terry L. Rathert, Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Thomas L. Laughlin, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
December 22, 2016 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, filed.(Oakes, Mark)
December 21, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Thomas L. Laughlin IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2017. (Bilek, Thomas)
December 19, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING SUPREME COURT'S DISPOSITION OF RELATED PETITION FOR CERTIORARI by BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John D. Gass, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Vello A. Kuuskraa, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Elliott Pew, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Terry L. Rathert, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Reed, Noelle)
December 16, 2016 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by John D. Gass, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, Vello A. Kuuskraa, Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, Elliott Pew, Terry L. Rathert, Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Motion to Remand due by 1/15/2017 Responses due by 2/14/2017. Replies due by 3/6/2017 (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
December 14, 2016 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND re: #7 Stipulation,, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Scott D. Musoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
December 12, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Scott D. Musoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Gass, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, Vello A. Kuuskraa, Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, Elliott Pew, Terry L. Rathert, Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Continuation List of Defendants Representing)(Reed, Noelle)
December 12, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred H Bennett. Judge Keith P Ellison no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
December 9, 2016 Filing 7 STIPULATION re: EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND by John D. Gass, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, Vello A. Kuuskraa, Kenneth R. Mourton, Steven L Mueller, Craig Owens, Elliott Pew, Terry L. Rathert, Southwestern Energy Company, Alan H. Stevens, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Keith P Ellison recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2017 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
December 5, 2016 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Comerica Securities, Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC identifying Bank of America Corporation, Citigroup Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Wells Fargo & Company, BNP Paribas, Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Bank of Montreal, Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Crdit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Royal Bank of Canada, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Socit Gnrale, BB&T Corporation, Baird Financial Group, Inc., Comerica Incorporated, Fifth Third Bancorp., HSBC Holdings plc, Heikkinen Energy Advisors, LLC, KeyCorp,, Macquarie Group Limited, The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Perella Weinberg Partners LLC, U.S. Bancorp as Corporate Parent, filed.(Acker, Charles)
December 5, 2016 Filing 3 CONSENT to Removal by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., RBS Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, CIBC World Markets Corp., SG Americas Securities, LLC, BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Comerica Securities, Inc., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., PNC Capital Markets LLC, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., filed.(Acker, Charles)
December 5, 2016 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwestern Energy Company, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
December 5, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, Texas, 61st Judicial District, case number 2016-70651 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17602159) filed by Catherine A. Kehr, Elliott Pew, Steven L Mueller, Greg D. Kerley, Vello A. Kuuskraa, Alan H. Stevens, Terry L. Rathert, Southwestern Energy Company, Craig Owens, Kenneth R. Mourton, John D. Gass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Index of Matters Being Filed, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - List of Counsel)(Reed, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund v. Southwestern Energy Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Rathert
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Gass
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L Mueller
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T Capital Markets, a division of BB&T Securities, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Kehr
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Securities Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vello A. Kuuskraa
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Owens
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc., now known as, MUFG Securities America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heikkinen Energy Securities, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan H. Stevens
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Pew
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC World Markets Corp.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth R. Mourton
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh C Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg D. Kerley
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Lucie County Fire District Firefighters' Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin
Represented By: Thomas E Bilek
Represented By: Geoffrey M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?