Transformer Protector Corp v. Kendrick et al
Plaintiff: Transformer Protector Corp
Defendant: Kendrick, William R. Kendrick and Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv00875
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OBJECTIONS to #123 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Redaction, filed by Transformer Protector Corp. (Morico, Paul)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE Transcript Redactions (September 6, 2018) by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed. (Warden, Thomas)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #121 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT re: Trial - Day 3 held on September 6, 2018 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Transformer Protector Corp Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2019., filed. (lwells, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Transformer Protector Corp. for Transcript of Trial September 4-6 before Judge Ellison. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (JenniferOlson, 4)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 10/25/18 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PERMANENT INJUNCTION granting #116 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morico, Paul)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Permanent Injunction)(Morico, Paul)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Thomas Rooney as Counsel by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. (Morico, Paul)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/3/2018. Attorneys for the parties continued to further negotiate and clarify the terms of the settlement agreement pursuant to the mediation agreement. Appearances: Thomas L Warden, Thomas Patrick Rooney, Paul Richard Morico.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 10:30 AM Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Transcript (Sealed) of proceedings held on held on September 7, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber JUDICIAL TRANSCRIBERS OF TEXAS, LLC, filed. (mahenry, )
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul R. Morico for Transcript of Telephone Conference on September 7, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Palermo. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Morico, Paul) Electronically Forwarded to JTT on 9/19/2018. Modified on 9/19/2018 (SamanthaWarda, 4).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. Third day of JURY TRIAL held on 9/6/2018. Argument heard on Plaintiffs sealed Trial Brief (Doc. No. 111) outside the presence of the jury. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion. Plaintiff moved to depose Mr. Pena on 9/7/2018. Defendants did not object, and the Court approved. Defendants moved to have all confidentiality designations on exhibits added by attorneys removed before the exhibits were given to the jury. The Court DENIES this motion. Unopposed exhibits offered will be entered into evidence. Witnesses: Vinod Sharma, Mason Buerger, William Kendrick. Jury trial to resume 9/10/2018 at 8:30 AM. Appearances: Christopher James Mierzejewski, Charles John Rogers, Darlene Fae Ghavimi, Thomas L Warden, Thomas Patrick Rooney, Amy Elizabeth Bergeron, Micaela Natalia Alfaro Gonzales, Paul Richard Morico.(Court Reporter: L. Wells)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MEDIATION continued on 9/6/2018. Settlement reached. Terms of agreement are under seal with the Clerk's office. Appearances: Thomas L Warden, Paul Richard Morico.(ERO:Yes), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Sealed Event, filed.
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. Second day of JURY TRIAL held on 9/5/2018. Argument heard on Defendants Motions in Limine No. 1 (Doc. No. #82 ). The Court DENIES Defendants Motion in Limine No. 1. The Court takes the remaining objections and Motions in Limine under advisement, and will resolve them as they come up at trial. Unopposed exhibits offered during trial are admitted. Plaintiff's Exhibit 4 is admitted over objection. Witnesses: Phillipe Magnier, Adry Ramos, Shyam Rao, Terry Wilt, and Jerry Basore by deposition. Trial to resume on 9/6/2018 at 8:30 AM. Appearances: Christopher James Mierzejewski, Charles John Rogers, Darlene Fae Ghavimi, Thomas L Warden, Thomas Patrick Rooney, Daniel David, Amy Elizabeth Bergeron, Micaela Natalia Alfaro Gonzales, Paul Richard Morico.(Court Reporter: L. Wells)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4) Modified on 9/6/2018 (arrivera, 4).
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. First day of JURY TRIAL held on 9/4/2018. Voir dire conducted and a panel of twelve jurors selected, seated and sworn in. First day of JURY TRIAL held on 9/4/2018. Opening statements given. Plaintiffs case begins. Unopposed exhibits offered during trial are admitted. Witness: Phillipe Magnier. Jury trial to resume 9/5/2018 at 8:30 AM Appearances: Christopher James Mierzejewski, Charles John Rogers, Darlene Fae Ghavimi, Thomas L Warden, Thomas Patrick Rooney, Daniel David, Amy Elizabeth Bergeron, Micaela Natalia Alfaro Gonzales, Paul Richard Morico.(Court Reporter: L. Wells)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 8/31/2018. The Defendants' equitable defenses will not be presented to the jury. Defendants' equitable defenses will be resolved if and when the Court decides whether to issue an injunction. Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. #98 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 is GRANTED, provided that Plaintiff not open the door to this evidence. The Court will address the remaining issues on September 4, 2018, at 9 AM before the start of trial. Appearances: Christopher James Mierzejewski, Charles John Rogers, Thomas L Warden, Thomas Patrick Rooney, Micaela Natalia Alfaro Gonzales, Paul Richard Morico.(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Sealed Event, filed.
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Setting as to #105 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Miscellaneous Hearing Re: The issue of Defendants' equitable defenses set for 8/31/2018 at 03:30 PM at by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2018. The parties will be allowed to present deposition clips in their case-in-chief in lieu of live testimony of adverse witnesses. Counter-designated portions of the deposition will be played after the responsive portion of designated testimony. Remaining issues will be addressed at 9 AM on 9/4/2018, before the trial begins. The motions in limine are deferred. Appearances: Thomas L Warden, Thomas Patrick Rooney, Amy Elizabeth Bergeron, Micaela Natalia Alfaro Gonzales, Paul Richard Morico.(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)(Warden, Thomas)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Pretrial Memorandum of Law by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(Morico, Paul)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Bergeron on behalf of Transformer Protector Corp, filed. (Bergeron, Amy)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER For Expedited Briefing on #98 MOTION for Reconsideration of #93 Memorandum and Order. Responses due by 8/28/2018. Replies due by 8/31/2018. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Reconsideration of #93 Memorandum and Order, by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O In Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Warden, Thomas)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Joint Request for PreTrial Conference by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. (Morico, Paul)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Letter to Judge Keith P. Ellison by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(Morico, Paul)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul R. Morico for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 6/28/2018 before Judge Ellison. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Metzger, filed. (Morico, Paul)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying #54 , #55 Motion to Exclude.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Mediation efforts continued held on 7/23/2018. Appearances:(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #56 #57 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Patent Ownership; denying #58 Defendant's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment as to Patent Ownership. The Court ORDERS Kendrick to execute an assignment of the issued patent to TPC(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #91 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2018 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber K. Metzger. Ordering Party Paul Morico Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2018, filed. (kmetzger)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY in Support of #82 MOTION In Limine Nos. 1-3, filed by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Warden, Thomas)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul Morico for Transcript of Motions Hearing on 6/28/2018 before Judge Keith Ellison. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Metzger, filed. (Morico, Paul)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 6/28/2018 For the reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims (Doc. Nos. #52 - #53 ). The Court takes Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (Doc. Nos. 54-55) under advisement. The Court takes Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Patent Ownership (Doc. Nos. 56-57) under advisement, along with the portions of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment related to patent ownership. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. #58 ) in all other respects. Trial is rescheduled for 9/4/2018. The joint pretrial order is due one week before trial. The motions in limine are deferred. ( Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2018., Jury Trial set for 9/4/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison). Appearances:Amy Bergeron. Christopher James Mierzejewski, Thomas L Warden, Thomas Patrick Rooney, Micaela Natalia Alfaro Gonzales, Paul Richard Morico.(Court Reporter: K. Metzger)(Law Clerk: M. Rock), filed.(arrivera, 4)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition to #82 MOTION In Limine Nos. 1-3, filed by Transformer Protector Corp. (Morico, Paul)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. MEDIATION held on 6/27/2018. Settlement not reached. Appearances:(ERO:NO), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. PRE MEDIATION TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/26/2018. Appearances: Charles John Rogers, Thomas L Warden, Micaela Natalia Alfaro Gonzales, Paul Richard Morico.(ERO:no), filed.(cfelchak, 4)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #73 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying motion to strike. The Court recognizes the Sur-Reply at Doc. No. 73.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION In Limine Nos. 1-3 by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits 1-5 in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine)(Warden, Thomas)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Darlene Ghavimi on behalf of William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed. (Ghavimi, Darlene)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Rogers on behalf of William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed. (Rogers, Charles)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Deposition of Prolec GE Pursuant to Letter of Request by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morico, Paul)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY in Support of #73 Sealed Event, filed by Transformer Protector Corp. (Morico, Paul)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Setting as to #58 Sealed Event, #54 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Denning, #57 Sealed Event, #55 Sealed Event, #53 Sealed Event, #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants Counterclaims, #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Claim for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Ownership, #73 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter from Office of the Secretary- Directorship General of Legal Affairs re: Letters rogatory, filed. (Attachments: #1 Translation) (arrivera, 4)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER MEDIATION set for 6/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Pre Mediation Telephone Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 03:00 PM Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Confidential Mediation Statements due by noon, 6/20/2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Sealed Event, filed.
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Sealed Event, filed.
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY in Support of #54 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Denning, filed by Transformer Protector Corp. (Morico, Paul)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Sealed Event, filed.
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION to Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #60 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions (Dkt. Nos. 52-58) ; Submission Date is EXTENDED to 5/8/2018 re: #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants Counterclaims, #54 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Denning, #53 Sealed Event, #57 Sealed Event, #55 Sealed Event, #58 Sealed Event, #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Claim for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Ownership. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions (Dkt. Nos. 52-58) by William R. Kendrick, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension through May 8, 2018)(Warden, Thomas)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Mierzejewski on behalf of William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed. (Mierzejewski, Christopher)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Claim for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Ownership by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2018. (Morico, Paul)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Denning by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morico, Paul)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants Counterclaims by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2018. (Morico, Paul)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Leave to Take One Expert Deposition Outside Expert Discovery Period and for Extension of Dispositive and Non-Dispositive Motion Deadline ( Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/12/2018., Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/12/2018.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Leave to Take One Expert Deposition Outside Expert Discovery Period and for Extension of Dispositive and Non-Dispositive Motion Deadline by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(David, Daniel)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION re: Joint Stipulation Regarding Third Party Documents by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(Morico, Paul)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Expert Report and Discovery Deadlines. The deadlines are as follows: Pltf's Supplemental Expert Report due by 3/19/2018, Deft's Rebuttal Expert Report due by 3/28/2018, Close of Expert Discovery by 4/4/2018, Dispositive & Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/5/201, Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/2/2018...*** Trial set for 7/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Expert Report and Discovery Deadlines by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morico, Paul)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter Rogatory Issued as to Secretaria de Relaciones Exteriores (SRE) Direccion General de Asuntos Juridicos acting as the Competent Judicial Authority of Mexico, filed.(olindor, 4)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Morico, Paul)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Rooney for Transcript of 1/22/18 Hearing on Motion to Compel before Judge Ellison. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (David, Daniel)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #29 that defendants produce and provide video and photographs within 7 days.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Letter to Judge Ellison with Joint Proposed Order Pursuant to Minute Entry of January 23, 2018, filed.(Morico, Paul)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 1/22/2018. Motion hearing (Doc. No. #29 ) on 1/22/2018. Motion to Compel is GRANTED subject to the limitations explained on the record. Parties will submit a proposed order for the video in LAPEMs possession, which Defendants will supply to LAPEM after the order is signed by the Court. Defendants are ordered to run a keyword searchunder the supervision of counselfor General Electric for the time period of 1/1/2014 through 1/1/2016. Appearances: Thomas L Warden, Paul Richard Morico.(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez)(Law Clerk: M. Rock), filed.(arrivera, 4)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Re-setting as to #39 Motion hearing re: #29 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Defendants' Test Showing the Faiilure of Their Product to Perform as Advertised. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 1/22/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. TIME CHANGE ONLY. (arrivera, 4)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Setting as to #29 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Defendants' Test Showing the Faiilure of Their Product to Perform as Advertised. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #29 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Defendants' Test Showing the Faiilure of Their Product to Perform as Advertised. Responses due by 1/5/2018..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension)(Warden, Thomas)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Expert Report due by 2/15/2018.. Rebuttal Expert Report due by 3/15/2018. Close Fact and Expert Discovery due by 3/29/2018. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter Rogatory Issued as to Secretaria de Relaciones Exteriores (SRE) Direccion General de Asuntos Juridicos, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(olindor, 4)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Reports and Discovery Deadlines by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morico, Paul)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment 1 to Letter of Request, #3 Proposed Order)(David, Daniel)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Defendants' Test Showing the Faiilure of Their Product to Perform as Advertised by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(David, Daniel)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed.(Warden, Thomas)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Sealed Event, filed.
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Transformer Protector Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(David, Daniel)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(David, Daniel)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Entry of Order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (rosaldana, 4)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Entry of Order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (rosaldana, 4)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Protective Order by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Morico, Paul)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Entry of Discovery Order by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Order)(Morico, Paul)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(Morico, Paul)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order *** The Court's initial conference setting is cancelled., filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING/DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Trial Term: 5-7 days. New Parties due by 11/16/2017 Pltf Expert Witness List & Report due by 2/1/2018. Deft Expert Witness List & Report due by 3/2/2018. Discovery due by 3/22/2018. Dispositive & Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/5/2018. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/2/2018. Trial set for 7/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Scheduling/Docket Control)(Morico, Paul)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by M.Natalie Alfaro Gonzales on behalf of Transformer Protector Corp, filed. (Alfaro Gonzales, Micaela)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPENDIX re: #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(David, Daniel)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY in Support of #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Transformer Protector Corp. (David, Daniel)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Answer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Settlement Agmt, #4 Exhibit 4 - Moores Fed. Prac., #5 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion)(Warden, Thomas)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 6/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting motion for leave to file exhibit D under seal to Plaintiff Transformer Protector Corp's Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny David on behalf of Transformer Protector Corp, filed. (David, Daniel)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Transformer Protector Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Morico, Paul)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(Morico, Paul)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by William R. Kendrick, Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., filed.(Warden, Thomas)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(Rooney, Thomas)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transformer Protector Corp, filed.(Rooney, Thomas)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/9/2017 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 201709675-7 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18087462) filed by Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc., William R. Kendrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order Transferring Case to 334th District Court, #4 Exhibit 3 - Waiver of Service, #5 Exhibit 4 - Defendants Answer and Counterclaims, #6 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet)(Warden, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transformer Protector Corp v. Kendrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transformer Protector Corp
Represented By: Paul Richard Morico
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Bergeron
Represented By: Daniel David
Represented By: Natalie Alfaro Gonzales
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Kendrick
Represented By: Thomas L Warden
Represented By: Charles John Rogers
Represented By: Christopher James Mierzejewski
Represented By: Darlene Fae Ghavimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Depressurization Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L Warden
Represented By: Charles John Rogers
Represented By: Christopher James Mierzejewski
Represented By: Darlene Fae Ghavimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?