Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC v. Visa Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC
Defendant: Visa Inc, MasterCard Incorporated, Barclays Bank of Delaware, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., First National Bank of Omaha, BA Merchant Services LLC, Fifth Third Bancorp, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Visa International Service Association, Citibank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Chase Bank USA, N.A., Mastercard International Incorporated, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, HSBC Finance Corporation, Visa Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Visa U.S.A., Inc., SunTrust Banks, Inc., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc. and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 4:2017cv01049
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2017 Filing 69 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Eastern District of New York to be included in MDL Docket No. 1720. (lgouadi, 4)
August 3, 2017 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of New York. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
August 3, 2017 Transfer of case to Eastern District of New York. New Case # assigned: 1:17-cv-04555 and received on 8/3/2017., filed. (jdav, 4)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying #60 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 21, 2017 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition to #60 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand, filed by BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank of Delaware, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., Fifth Third Bancorp, First National Bank of Omaha, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC. (Kaplan, Lee)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Demian A. Ordway to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 14, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for Demian A. Ordway to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visa Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/4/2017. (Kaplan, Lee)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jamie Alan Aycock terminated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #60 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand Responses due by 7/21/2017.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 7, 2017 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Jamie A. Aycock to Withdraw as Attorney by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zavitsanos, John)
July 7, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Warshauer on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., filed. (Warshauer, Jordan)
July 6, 2017 Filing 60 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/27/2017. (Wynne, David)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Agreed Motion and Stipulation to Postpone Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 30, 2017 Filing 58 Agreed MOTION Postpone Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
May 8, 2017 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to #54 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC. (Wynne, David)
May 4, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer to MDL 1720 by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wynne, David)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 28, 2017 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank of Delaware, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., Fifth Third Bancorp, First National Bank of Omaha, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit C to Exhibit 1, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Remand)(Weber, Bradley)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Brian Calandra to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Christopher Lanzalotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #45 Motion for James Tallon to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 24, 2017 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by First National Bank of Omaha, filed.(Turner, Eliot)
April 24, 2017 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fifth Third Bancorp, filed.(Turner, Eliot)
April 24, 2017 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corporation, filed.(Turner, Eliot)
April 24, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION for Brian Calandra to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barclays Bank of Delaware, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2017. (Brown, Brent)
April 24, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for Christopher Lanzalotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barclays Bank of Delaware, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2017. (Brown, Brent)
April 24, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION for James Tallon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barclays Bank of Delaware, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2017. (Brown, Brent)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Frederick N. Egler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 20, 2017 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Barclays Bank of Delaware, filed.(Brown, Brent)
April 20, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent L. Brown on behalf of Barclays Bank of Delaware, filed. (Brown, Brent)
April 19, 2017 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, filed.(Hampton, Charles)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond and/or answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before a date that is 14 days after the Court enters a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 18, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Frederick N. Egler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2017. (Duffy, Edward)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Donna m. Ioffredo to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Alex M. Hyman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Kenneth A. Gallo to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Gary R. Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion for David Lesser to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Perry A. Lange to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Andrew J. Frackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Abby F. Rudzin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 17, 2017 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., filed.(Slade, Jared)
April 14, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for David Lesser to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2017. (Weber, Bradley)
April 14, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Perry A. Lange to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2017. (Weber, Bradley)
April 14, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley C. Weber on behalf of HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., filed. (Weber, Bradley)
April 14, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Donna M. Ioffredo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2017. (Buthod, Tynan)
April 14, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Alex M. Hyman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2017. (Buthod, Tynan)
April 14, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Kenneth A. Gallo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2017. (Buthod, Tynan)
April 14, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Cary R. Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2017. (Buthod, Tynan)
April 13, 2017 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank of Delaware, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., Fifth Third Bancorp, First National Bank of Omaha, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, Charles)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Peter E. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Boris Bershteyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 13, 2017 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., filed.(Zavitsanos, John)
April 13, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Andrew J. Frackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/4/2017. (Zavitsanos, John)
April 13, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Abby F. Rudzin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/4/2017. (Zavitsanos, John)
April 13, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Aycock on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., filed. (Aycock, Jamie)
April 13, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Zavitsanos on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., filed. (Zavitsanos, John)
April 12, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Peter E. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2017. (Reed, Noelle)
April 12, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Boris Bershteyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2017. (Reed, Noelle)
April 11, 2017 Filing 12 Supplemental CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Reed, Noelle)
April 11, 2017 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., filed.(Duffy, Edward)
April 10, 2017 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, filed.(Buthod, Tynan)
April 10, 2017 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., filed.(LeRoy, Tracy)
April 10, 2017 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc. identifying HSBC Holdings, PLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Cowie, Roger)
April 10, 2017 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc., filed.(Kaplan, Lee)
April 7, 2017 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Wynne, David)
April 7, 2017 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC, filed.(Wynne, David)
April 7, 2017 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC.(Wynne, David)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
April 5, 2017 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Reed, Noelle)
April 5, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd, case number 2017-11213 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18178191) filed by Capital One Financial Corporation, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, Visa U.S.A., Inc., Fifth Third Bancorp, SunTrust Banks, Inc., Visa Inc., First National Bank of Omaha, SunTrust Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, BA Merchant Services LLC, Visa International Service Association, Capital One, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Barclays Bank of Delaware, MasterCard Incorporated, Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., HSB Finance Corporation, Mastercard International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reed, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC v. Visa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Wynne
Represented By: Scott G Burdine
Represented By: David Edwards Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MasterCard Incorporated
Represented By: Tynan Buthod
Represented By: Donna M Ioffredo
Represented By: Alex M Hyman
Represented By: Gary R Carney
Represented By: Kenneth A Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank of Delaware
Represented By: James Tallon
Represented By: Brent Lockhart Brown
Represented By: Christopher Lanzalotto
Represented By: Brian Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Aycock
Represented By: Andrew J Frackman
Represented By: Jordan Lyn Warshauer
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: John Zavitsanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Eliot Fielding Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BA Merchant Services LLC
Represented By: Eliot Fielding Turner
Represented By: Layne Edwin Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bancorp
Represented By: Eliot Fielding Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Perry A Lange
Represented By: Bradley C Weber
Represented By: Roger Brian Cowie
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Represented By: Demian A Ordway
Represented By: Lee L Kaplan
Represented By: Mark R. Merley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Tracy N LeRoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Peter E Greene
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jamie Alan Aycock
Represented By: Andrew J Frackman
Represented By: Jordan Lyn Warshauer
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: John Zavitsanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Aycock
Represented By: Andrew J Frackman
Represented By: Jordan Lyn Warshauer
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: John Zavitsanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Charles Bedford Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Peter E Greene
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Represented By: Tynan Buthod
Represented By: Donna M Ioffredo
Represented By: Alex M Hyman
Represented By: Gary R Carney
Represented By: Kenneth A Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Peter E Greene
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick N Egler
Represented By: Bruce Allen Blefeld
Represented By: Edward William Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles Bedford Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corporation
Represented By: Perry A Lange
Represented By: Bradley C Weber
Represented By: Roger Brian Cowie
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Demian A Ordway
Represented By: Lee L Kaplan
Represented By: Mark R. Merley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy N LeRoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Eliot Fielding Turner
Represented By: Layne Edwin Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Demian A Ordway
Represented By: Lee L Kaplan
Represented By: Mark R. Merley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: Jared M Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis R Bettison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Jared M Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?