Shields v. Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joe Shields
Defendant: BPCL Management LLC, James Verrillo, Clement Scantlebury, Daniel Lambert, Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc and Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc doing business as 360Getaways.net
Case Number: 4:2017cv01813
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on 10/30/2017.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
October 27, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Joe Shields, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/17/2017. (jguajardo, 4)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial conference held Appearances: Joe Shields (pro se). Ct Reporter: ERO. No appearance by Defendants.Another pretrial conference is set for November 6, 2017 at 10:30 a.m.Mr. Shields must serve by first class and certified mail on each Defendant the complaint,summons and a copy of this minute order.Failure of Defendants to appear for the November 6, 2017 conference, may result in adefault judgment being entered against them. Defendants may appear in person, or bytelephone for the conference by requesting to do so by emailing the Courts CaseManager Shelia_Ashabranner@txs.uscourts.gov. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Main Document 21 replaced on 10/6/2017) (sashabranner, 4). Modified on 10/6/2017 (sashabranner, 4).
September 26, 2017 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc served on 8/26/2017, answer due 9/18/2017, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
September 26, 2017 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to James Verrillo served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017, filed.(drodriguez, 7)
September 26, 2017 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Daniel Lambert served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017, filed.(drodriguez, 7)
September 26, 2017 Filing 17 Docketed in Error- Summons Issued as to Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by email, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) Modified on 9/26/2017 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
September 26, 2017 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clement Scantlebury served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017, filed.(drodriguez, 7)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Initial Conference rescheduled to 9/28/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
September 19, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Setting as to #13 Minute Entry Order. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/29/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas, filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Conference held. At the hearing the Court made the following rulings: Parties failed to appear. Another pretrial conference is set for September 29, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Mr. Shields must notify all defendants of this conference within one business day of receiving this order. Mr. Shields must file proof of service of this order for the next conference by September 22, 2017. Mr. Shields must serve by first class and certified mail each defendant with notice of the conference through a copy of this minute order, and if Mr. Shields has email addresses for any defendant, he must serve the order electronically also. Failure to make service of this order timely and to file the necessary proofs of service will be taken as failure to prosecute this case and lack of diligence by plaintiff and will be grounds for dismissal of claims without prejudice. Furthermore, failure of Mr. Shields to make service of the summons and complaint, and to file proof of service, on or before September 29, 2017, will be deemed a failure to prosecute this case against any unserved defendants, and will result in dismissal of plaintiffs claims against the unserved defendants. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
August 21, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Alternate Service by Joe Shields, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter)(jguajardo, 4)
August 15, 2017 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to BPCL Management LLC served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017, filed.(jengonzalez, 7)
August 11, 2017 Summons Issued as to Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc, Daniel Lambert, Clement Scantlebury, James Verrillo. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
August 10, 2017 Summons Issued as to Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(dperez, 3)
August 10, 2017 Summons Issued as to Daniel Lambert. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(dperez, 3)
August 10, 2017 Summons Issued as to James Verrillo. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(dperez, 3)
August 10, 2017 Summons Issued as to Clement Scantlebury. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(dperez, 3)
July 13, 2017 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joe Shields, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
June 30, 2017 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (klove, 4)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 23, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Permission to File Electronically by Joe Shields, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(gclair, 4)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Denying #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
June 14, 2017 Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number GAL003394, filed. (agould, 3)
June 14, 2017 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM In Support re: #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Joe Shields, filed.(lusmith, 3)
June 14, 2017 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 7/5/2017.), MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Joe Shields, filed. (lusmith, 3)
June 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Shields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lusmith, 3)
June 14, 2017 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(lusmith, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPCL Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Verrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Scantlebury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Ticket Getaways, Inc doing business as 360Getaways.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?