Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC and Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., Catamaran Corp., Catamaran PBM of Illinois, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, Catamaran LLC, BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc. and OptumRx, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv03800
Filed: December 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Referring Judge: Frances H Stacy
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #53 Notice of Appeal, to Alec Sauchik for Appellant. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 19-20264), filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 10, 2019 *** Electronic access has not been assigned to Appellant Counsel. Attorney of record has not filed notice of appearance with the Fifth Circuit, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 10, 2019 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #53 Notice of Appeal, to Whitesell, S. Lee; Ellsworth, Jessica Lynn; Boyce, Maria Wyckoff (Counsel for Appellee). Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 19-20264), filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 10, 2019 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #53 Notice of Appeal, USCA No. 19-20264, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
May 28, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE to #59 Objections , filed by BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria)
May 20, 2019 Filing 59 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Bill of Costs [No. 58], filed by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC. (Sauchik, Alec)
May 2, 2019 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 19-20264 re: #53 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
April 29, 2019 Filing 58 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $11,584.12 by BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Boyce, Maria)
April 29, 2019 Filing 57 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Plaintiffs. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Scheduling Conference on 05/01/2018 before Magistrate Judge Stacy. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas. This order form relates to the following: Scheduling Conference,, filed.(Sauchik, Alec) Electronically forwarded COPY transcript request to Exceptional Reporting Services on 4/29/(SarahShelby, 4).
April 29, 2019 Filing 56 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Plaintiffs. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Status Conference on 1/23/19 before Magistrate Judge Stacy. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services. This order form relates to the following: 46 Status Conference,, filed.(Sauchik, Alec) Electronically forwarded COPY transcript request to Exceptional Reporting Services on 4/29/2019 (SarahShelby, 4).
April 19, 2019 Filing 55 Proposed Final Judgment by BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed.(Boyce, Maria)
April 19, 2019 Appeal Review Notes re: #53 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal. Some transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 2, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
April 19, 2019 Filing 54 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #53 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): ERO, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (EdnitaPonce, 1)
April 18, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #52 Order Adopting Memorandum and Recommendations, #50 Memorandum and Recommendations, by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-22268838), filed. (Sauchik, Alec)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING #50 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motion to dismiss #16 is granted. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
March 20, 2019 Filing 51 OBJECTIONS to #50 Memorandum and Recommendations, filed by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC. (Sauchik, Alec)
March 7, 2019 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: Granting #16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Objections to M&R due by 3/21/2019(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
January 31, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #48 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
January 30, 2019 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT re: HEARING held on 1/23/19 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party MARIA W. BOYCE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2019., filed. (thudson, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 47 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maria Boyce for Transcript of Status Conference on 1/23/19 before Magistrate Frances H. Stacy. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Boyce, Maria) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on Jan 24. Estimated completion date is Jan 31. Modified on 1/24/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4).
January 23, 2019 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2019; Oral discussion of Motion for Summary Judgment heard, and taken under advisement. Appearances:Lee Whitesell. Maria Wyckoff Boyce, Aaron Robert Crane, Kristina Giyaur, Alec Sauchik.(Court Reporter: ERO)(Digital # 10:58 - 11:19)(ERO:K Picota), filed.(bwhite, 4)
December 28, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion to reschedule Status Conference.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
December 21, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re #42 Unopposed MOTION To Reschedule January 10, 2019 Status Conference, filed. (rhawkins)
December 20, 2018 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION To Reschedule January 10, 2019 Status ConferenceMotions referred to Frances H Stacy. by BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Status Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #39 Joint MOTION for Protective OrderJoint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Protective Order (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
December 7, 2018 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order, Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Protective Order( Motion Docket Date 12/28/2018.)Motions referred to Frances H Stacy. by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sauchik, Alec)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LaurenWebster, 4)
July 16, 2018 Filing 37 CORRECTED NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Andrew S Hanen, pursuant to General Order No. 2018-10. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect. Parties notified, filed. (ltien, 4)
July 13, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, pursuant to General Order No. 2018-10. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge Melinda Harmon no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (rwestmoreland, 4)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #28 Motion to Stay. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
May 31, 2018 Filing 34 REPLY in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Boyce, Maria)
May 30, 2018 Filing 33 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #32 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
May 29, 2018 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Appearance held on May 1, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Maria W. Boyce Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
May 25, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re #28 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed. (rhawkins)
May 24, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to #28 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sauchik, Alec)
May 16, 2018 Filing 29 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maria Boyce for Transcript of Scheduling Conference on 05/01/18 before Magistrate Frances H. Stacy. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Boyce, Maria) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 5/17/2018. Estimated transcript completion date: 5/31/2018. (LaurenWebster)
May 3, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria)
May 1, 2018 Filing 27 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Alec Sauchik for Transcript of Scheduling Conference, 05/01/2018, Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Sauchik, Alec)
May 1, 2018 Filing 26 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maria Boyce for Transcript of Scheduling Conference on 05/01/18 before Magistrate Frances H. Stacy. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Boyce, Maria)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/25/2019 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/28/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 6/28/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 8/21/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 8/21/2019. Discovery due by 10/9/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/1/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/1/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/28/2020. Docket Call set for 2/7/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Melinda Harmon. Trial Term by 2/10/2020(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
May 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/1/2018; docket control order to follow. Appearances: Maria Wyckoff Boyce, Aaron Robert Crane, Kristina Giyaur.(Court Reporter: ERO)(Digital # 10:15 - 10:28)(ERO:D Sillas), filed.(bwhite, 4)
April 25, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Boyce, Maria)
April 20, 2018 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
April 10, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Sauchik, Alec)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time, Plaintiff's opposition papers to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by April 10, 2018, Defendants' reply to Plaintiff's opposition papers shall be filed by April 25, 2018.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time filing opposition and reply to defendants' motion to dismiss by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sauchik, Alec)
February 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Whitesell on behalf of BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed. (Crane, Aaron)
February 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Crane on behalf of BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed. (Crane, Aaron)
February 28, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Blayne Thompson on behalf of BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed. (Thompson, Blayne)
February 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint ( Motion Docket Date 3/20/2018.), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BriovaRx of Maine, Inc., BriovaRx, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria)
January 19, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UnitedHealth Group Inc., filed.(Boyce, Maria)
January 9, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to UnitedHealth Group Inc. served on 12/29/2017, answer due 2/27/2018, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
January 9, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to United Healthcare Services, Inc. served on 12/29/2017, answer due 2/27/2018, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
January 9, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc. served on 12/29/2017, answer due 2/27/2018, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
January 9, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to OptumRx, Inc. served on 12/29/2017, answer due 2/27/2018, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
January 9, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Catamaran PBM of Illinois, Inc. served on 12/29/2017, answer due 2/27/2018, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
January 9, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BriovaRx of Maine, Inc. served on 12/29/2017, answer due 2/27/2018, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
January 9, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BriovaRx, LLC served on 12/29/2017, answer due 2/27/2018, filed.(Sauchik, Alec)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Alec Sauchik to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Kristina Giyaur to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 19, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Kristina Giyaur to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2018. (Leichter, Louis)
December 19, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Alec Sauchik to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2018. (Leichter, Louis)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
December 18, 2017 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC, filed.(Leichter, Louis)
December 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19349364) filed by Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC, JAMMZ Chemists LLC, Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leichter, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedra Pharmacy Houston LLC
Represented By: Louis Daniel Leichter
Represented By: Kristina Giyaur
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMMZ Chemists LLC
Represented By: Louis Daniel Leichter
Represented By: Kristina Giyaur
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles LLC
Represented By: Louis Daniel Leichter
Represented By: Kristina Giyaur
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Blayne R. Thompson
Represented By: Aaron Robert Crane
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Represented By: Blayne R. Thompson
Represented By: Aaron Robert Crane
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamaran Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamaran PBM of Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BriovaRx, LLC
Represented By: Blayne R. Thompson
Represented By: Aaron Robert Crane
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamaran LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BriovaRx of Maine, Inc.
Represented By: Blayne R. Thompson
Represented By: Aaron Robert Crane
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Blayne R. Thompson
Represented By: Aaron Robert Crane
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Blayne R. Thompson
Represented By: Aaron Robert Crane
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?