County of Harris v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Harris
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Actavis, Inc., Arun Sharma, M.D., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Richard Arthur Evans, M.D., Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA Inc., NexGen Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC d/b/a Neos Therapeutics LP, Mylan Pharms Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Allergan Sales LLC, Advanced Pharma, Inc. d/b/a Avella Specialty Pharmacy and/or Avella of Houston, ICU Medical Sales Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Mylan Speciality, LP, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Devido, Gazelle Craig, M.D., Insys Manufacturing LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Mission Pharmacal Company, Karin Sharma, M.D., Mylan, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., ICU Medical Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, Arun Sharma, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Richard Arthur Evans, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan PLC, Advanced Pharma, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Gazelle Craig, Karin Sharma, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company and Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00490
Filed: February 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Filing 109 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC re: #106 Order of Dismissal,, filed. (drodriguez, 7)
June 7, 2018 RECEIPT of Transfer received via Email Notification re: transfer of case to Northern District of Ohio. New Case # assigned: 1:18-op-45677 and received on 06/07/2018., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
June 6, 2018 Filing 108 Nexgen Pharma, Inc.'s Request for Removal From Service List by NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed.(Davies, Tracey)
June 6, 2018 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
June 6, 2018 Filing 107 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER OF DISMISSAL that pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of the filed on May 31, 2018 the following defendants are dismissed with prejudice Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 31, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Mylan Speciality, LP, Mylan Pharms Inc., Mylan, Inc. by Mylan Speciality, LP, Mylan Pharms Inc., Mylan, Inc., filed. (Boyce, Maria)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Continuance. The deadlines for the Rule 26(f) conference and report, and the Rule 16 case management conference are continued until the JPML and this Court have had an opportunity to rule on pending motions.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 30, 2018 Filing 103 Unopposed SUPPLEMENT to #101 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines by Abbott Laboratories, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA Inc., Cephalon, Inc., David Devido, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Richard Arthur Evans, Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Mylan, Inc., Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Fresenius USA to respond to Plaintiff's lawsuit is extended to July 20, 2018.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 29, 2018 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
May 29, 2018 Filing 100 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan Finance LLC re: #89 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (drodriguez, 7)
May 29, 2018 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, filed.(McConnico, Stephen)
May 25, 2018 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Respond by Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lunceford, Erin)
May 25, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE Letter to Honorable David Hittner by ICU Medical Sales Inc., filed. (Caire, Brandon)
May 18, 2018 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
May 18, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE Supplement to Certficate of Interested Parties by Richard Arthur Evans, filed. (Hetherington, G)
May 18, 2018 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
May 18, 2018 Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allergan Finance LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack)
May 17, 2018 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allergan Finance LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack)
May 17, 2018 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
May 8, 2018 Filing 90 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #79 Notice of Reassignment Following Recusal, filed. (sanderson, 4)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Fresenius USA to respond to Plaintiff's lawsuit is extended to June 4, 2018.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 3, 2018 Filing 88 Request for Expedited Consideration of Its Motion to Remand by County of Harris, filed.(Gallagher, Michael)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 3, 2018 Filing 86 Mail Returned Undeliverable (Return to Sender/Unable to Forward) as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #78 Recusal Order, filed. (rnieto, 1)
May 3, 2018 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lunceford, Erin)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit until May 4, 2018..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Nonsuit as to all claims against Nexgen Pharma, Inc..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Stacey Anne Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 24, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
April 20, 2018 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lunceford, Erin)
April 20, 2018 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Christopher)
April 20, 2018 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Nonsuit without prejudice of Nexgen Pharma, Inc., by County of Harris and Nexgen Parma, Inc. by NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falconer, Russell)
April 20, 2018 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Complaint Response Deadline by Abbott Laboratories, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Mylan, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah)
April 18, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION for Stacey Anne Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2018. (Vitale, Christina)
April 16, 2018 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed.(Dawson, William)
April 10, 2018 Filing 71 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #69 Order, filed. (vcantu, 5)
March 30, 2018 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by David Devido, filed.(Hilder, Philip)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #2 MOTION to Remand Replies due by 4/6/2018(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 28, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. McConnico on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, filed. (McConnico, Stephen)
March 23, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell H. Falconer on behalf of NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. (Falconer, Russell)
March 23, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Davies on behalf of NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. (Davies, Tracey)
March 23, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie K. McGuire on behalf of David Devido, filed. (McGuire, Stephanie)
March 23, 2018 Filing 64 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Allergan PLC re: #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, filed. (cvillegas, 7)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's lawsuit; Answer due for NexGen Pharma, Inc. 4/20/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 23, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Dawson on behalf of NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. (Dawson, William)
March 22, 2018 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to this Lawsuit by NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falconer, Russell)
March 22, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Creech on behalf of David Devido, filed. (Creech, Paul)
March 22, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip H. Hilder on behalf of David Devido, filed. (Hilder, Philip)
March 19, 2018 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed.(Jones, Christopher)
March 19, 2018 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC identifying Neos Therapeutics, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Jones, Christopher)
March 15, 2018 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, filed by Karin Sharma. (klopez, 7)
March 14, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, #29 Memorandum Joinder, filed by Mission Pharmacal Company. (Johnson, Brian)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC 4/20/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 13, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE Opposition to Mylan Inc.'s Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Perry, Charles)
March 13, 2018 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Remand, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Perry, Charles)
March 13, 2018 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit)(Jones, Christopher)
March 13, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra A. LoCasto on behalf of Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. (LoCasto, Alexandra)
March 13, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Jones on behalf of Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. (Jones, Christopher)
March 12, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon E. Caire on behalf of ICU Medical Sales Inc., filed. (Caire, Brandon)
March 12, 2018 Filing 46 STATEMENT of Non-Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by ICU Medical Sales Inc., filed.(Caire, Brandon)
March 9, 2018 Filing 47 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch - Kirkland and Ellis - Return to Sender - Unable to Forward as to Allergan re: #4 Order for Initial Conference, filed. (rnieto, 1)
March 8, 2018 Filing 45 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch, Kirkland and Ellis #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
March 8, 2018 Filing 44 Letter to Honorable Nancy F. Atlas by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perry, Charles)
March 8, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel by County of Harris, filed. (Gallagher, Michael)
March 7, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed.(Scott, Robert)
March 7, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Vitale, Christina)
March 7, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed.(Vitale, Christina)
March 7, 2018 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Vitale, Christina)
March 7, 2018 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mission Pharmacal Company, filed.(Johnson, Brian)
March 7, 2018 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed.(Vitale, Christina)
March 7, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Advanced Pharma, Inc., filed.(Foley, Zandra)
March 7, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
March 7, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
March 7, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mylan, Inc., filed.(Boyce, Maria)
March 7, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
March 7, 2018 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories, filed.(Ertas, Alper)
March 6, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Charles)
March 6, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #2 MOTION to Remand by Mylan, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria)
March 6, 2018 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Knoll Pharmaceutical Company identifying AbbVie Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Wilkes, John)
March 1, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY in Support of #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perry, Charles)
March 1, 2018 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. identifying McKesson Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Jordan, Marquel)
March 1, 2018 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Jordan, Marquel)
February 27, 2018 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insys Manufacturing LLC identifying INSYS Therapeutics, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
February 27, 2018 Filing 23 Certificate of Service in a Removed Action by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
February 27, 2018 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
February 27, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Sarokhanian on behalf of Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed. (Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
February 27, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Raley, Matthew)
February 27, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Mylan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria)
February 27, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Raley, Matthew)
February 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Zandra E. Foley and Cory S. Reed on behalf of Advanced Pharma, Inc. d/b/a Avella Specialty Pharmacy and/or Avella of Houston, filed. (Foley, Zandra)
February 26, 2018 Filing 16 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Richard Arthur Evans, M.D., filed.(Hetherington, G)
February 26, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Richard Arthur Evans, M.D., filed.(Hetherington, G)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Cardinal Health 110 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 200 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 414 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; McKesson Corporation 4/23/2018; McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. 4/23/2018; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Cardinal Health 110 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 200 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 414 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; McKesson Corporation 4/23/2018; McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. 4/23/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
February 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document #10 by County of Harris, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael)
February 23, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael)
February 22, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying AmerisourceBergen Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Perry, Charles)
February 22, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3)(Gallagher, Michael)
February 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time - Manufacturer Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
February 22, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time - Manufacturer Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah)
February 22, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint under Rule 12, filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael)
February 21, 2018 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
February 21, 2018 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
February 20, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand re: #2 MOTION to Remand by County of Harris, filed.(Gallagher, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand by County of Harris, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael)
February 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133 District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2017-82618 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19619838) filed by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 200 LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Harris v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Alper T Ertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Marquel Sautural Jordan
Represented By: Robert Philip Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arun Sharma, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Andrew J O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Represented By: Marquel Sautural Jordan
Represented By: Robert Philip Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414 LLC
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Arthur Evans, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NexGen Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: William B Dawson
Represented By: Russell H. Falconer
Represented By: Tracey B Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc.
Represented By: Erin E Lunceford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC d/b/a Neos Therapeutics LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharms Inc.
Represented By: Adam K Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales LLC
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pharma, Inc. d/b/a Avella Specialty Pharmacy and/or Avella of Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICU Medical Sales Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Egan Caire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110 LLC
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Speciality, LP
Represented By: Adam K Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Devido
Represented By: Paul L Creech
Represented By: Stephanie K McGuire
Represented By: Philip Harlan Hilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gazelle Craig, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200 LLC
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Pharmacal Company
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karin Sharma, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICU Medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kabi USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arun Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Arthur Evans
Represented By: G Riley Hetherington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Donna M Welch
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Zandra E Foley
Represented By: Robert W Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Donna M Welch
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gazelle Craig
Represented By: Don E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karin Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Represented By: John Laurens Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Ann LoCasto
Represented By: Christopher Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Harris
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Represented By: Vincent Reed Ryan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?