Tomas Esparza v. Thermos, LLC

Plaintiff: Tomas Esparza
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50, inclusive and Thermos, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02247
Filed: July 2, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 04:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
July 2, 2018 26 Case transferred in from California Central. Case Number 2:18-cv-02252; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
June 28, 2018 25 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING THIS CASE FROM THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS FOR ALL PURPOSES #23 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED This matter is to be immediately transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas for all future proceedings. All dates in this Court are vacated and any future dates will be set by the assigned Court in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
June 28, 2018 24 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Transfer Case #23 (Goldberg, Tracy)
June 26, 2018 23 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC.(Goldberg, Tracy)
June 21, 2018 22 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC (Goldberg, Tracy)
June 13, 2018 21 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Discoverable Information filed by Plaintiff Tomas Esparza (Taillieu, Olivier)
May 25, 2018 20 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Amended filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC.(Goldberg, Tracy)
May 24, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO DEFENDANT THERMOS, L.L.C. TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #18 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Thermos, L.L.C. is granted leave to file an amended answer to the complaint. Defendant Thermos, L.L.C. shall electronically file its Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by 5:00 p.m. on May 25, 2018. (iv)
May 24, 2018 18 STIPULATION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amended Answer to Plantiff's Complaint and to Deem Attached Amended Answer Filed, #2 Supplement Proposed Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Goldberg, Tracy)
May 21, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by 8/6/2018. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 1/25/2019. Last Day to Hear Motions 2/25/2019. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 4/15/2019. Lodge Pretrial Conference Order 4/22/2019. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 5/6/2019 at 11:00 AM. Trial set for 5/28/2019 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
May 21, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/11/2019. (iv)
May 21, 2018 15 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called and counsel make their appearance. The Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets dates. Please see separate Order Re Jury Trial, also filed today. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
May 9, 2018 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Goldberg, Tracy)
May 8, 2018 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Report Rule 26(f) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Pursuant to the Court's April 4, 2018 Order, Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet is missing. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging to submit the omitted worksheet. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
May 8, 2018 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC.. (Goldberg, Tracy)
April 18, 2018 11 OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFF filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC. (Goldberg, Tracy)
April 4, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 5/21/2018 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
April 2, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC.(Goldberg, Tracy)
March 21, 2018 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 20, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 20, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
March 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Tomas Esparza in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/31/2018, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 19, 2018 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Thermos, LLC. (Goldberg, Tracy)
March 19, 2018 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tracy Wayne Goldberg counsel for Movant Thermos, LLC. Adding Tracy W. Goldberg as counsel of record for Thermos, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC. (Goldberg, Tracy)
March 19, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC, identifying Tomas Esparza. (Goldberg, Tracy)
March 19, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: 0973-21434665 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Thermos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint for Damages for 1. Product Liability - Strict Liability 2. Products Liability - Negligence 3. Negligence) (Attorney Tracy Wayne Goldberg added to party Thermos, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Goldberg, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomas Esparza v. Thermos, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermos, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Wayne Goldberg
Represented By: David James McTaggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Esparza
Represented By: Judd Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?