Kelley et al. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Janice Kelley and Danny R Kelley
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02528
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 Conditional DISMISSAL. Having been advised that the parties have reached a settlement, this case is dismissed with prejudice. By 9/29/2018 the parties may move for reinstatement. The 8/30/2018 conference is cancelled. Case terminated on 8/30/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ghassan, 4)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Janice Kelley, filed. (Wiley, Rob)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Jacocks on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. (Jacocks, Eric)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 8/30/2018 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Defendants Disclosure of Interested Parties by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. (Fennegan, James)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th District Court, case number 2018-38256 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20503924) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C1, #5 Exhibit C2, #6 Exhibit C3, #7 Exhibit C4, #8 Exhibit C5, #9 Exhibit C6, #10 Exhibit C7, #11 Exhibit C8, #12 Exhibit D)(Fennegan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Kelley
Represented By: Rob L Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny R Kelley
Represented By: Rob L Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: James Garth Fennegan
Represented By: Eric Alexander Jacocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?