Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited

In Re: Erin Energy Corporation
Appellant: Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited
Case Number: 4:2018cv02643
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion; granting #6 Motion to Modify.1. The Parties proposed briefing schedule set forth in the Motion is herebyapproved.2. Appellant shall serve and file its brief on or before November 10, 2018.1 The last four digits of Erin Energy Corporations federal tax identification number are 9798. The other Debtors inthese cases are: Erin Energy Limited; Erin Energy Kenya Limited; and Erin Petroleum Nigeria Limited.23. Appellees shall serve and file its brief on or before December 28, 2018.4. The filing of the Motion and the entry of this order (the Order) is withoutprejudice to, and does not affect or limit, the rights and positions of the Appellant or Appellees inany respects, other than modifying the briefing schedule as expressly set forth herein.5. Nothing herein shall preclude the Appellant or Appellees from seeking furtherextensions to their deadlines to file briefs pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure8018(a), as may be appropriate, subject to the party(ies) moving for such relief and notice andopportunity to be heard.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
September 12, 2018 6 Unopposed MOTION ( Motion Docket Date 10/3/2018.), MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule as to #5 Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018, by Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rios, Randall)
August 27, 2018 5 Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 8/27/2018, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Atlas, Civil Action 4:18-cv-2643. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 27, 2018 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (Attachments: #1 Record Part 2, #2 Petition for 18-32109)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 14, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion for Ronald J. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
August 14, 2018 2 MOTION for Ronald J. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2018. (Rios, Randall)
August 1, 2018 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court. On 7/30/2018, Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Nancy Atlas, Civil Action 4:18cv2643. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 notice of appeal)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Erin Energy Corporation
Represented By: David L Curry, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Okin
Represented By: Ryan Anthony O'Connor
Represented By: John Thomas Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited
Represented By: Ronald J. Silverman
Represented By: Timothy Aaron Million
Represented By: Randall A Rios
Represented By: John D. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?