De La Rosa v. Secretary of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff: Maria de la Rosa
Defendant: Secretary of Health and Human Services, Secretary Of The Treasury and Continental Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02644
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel N Wiley on behalf of Continental Services Group, Inc., Secretary Of The Treasury, Secretary of Health and Human Services, filed. (Wiley, Ariel)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Management ORDER. De La Rosa abandons all claims that do not derive from the Social Security Act. By 10/8/2018, the Secretary of Health and Human Services must give all of De La Rosa's records to her. By 10/29/2018, the parties will file a joint status report. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: John Escover, Eleanor Robinson-Gaither, Ariel Wiley. Ct Reporter: G. Dye. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 11/5/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 4, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Robinson Gaither on behalf of Secretary of Health and Human Services, filed. (Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for John W. Escover to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 20, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for John W Escover to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maria de la Rosa, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2018. (scastillo, 1)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4)
August 1, 2018 Filing 29 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:17-cv-00833; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-styled cause of action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
June 12, 2018 Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Secretary of Health and Human Services. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Secretary of Health and Human Services. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (klw)
February 13, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Maria De La Rosa, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Secretary of Health and Human Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Escover, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #23 Motion to Withdraw #21 Corrected Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
January 23, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw #21 Amended MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by Secretary of Health and Human Services. (Girvin, Ralph)
January 22, 2018 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by Secretary of Health and Human Services. (Girvin, Ralph)
January 22, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by Secretary of Health and Human Services. (Girvin, Ralph)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Joint #19 Motion to Stay Discovery and Scheduling Recommendations. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 12, 2018 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Scheduling Order Recommendations by Secretary of Health and Human Services. (Girvin, Ralph)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment until 02/16/18. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
December 28, 2017 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Maria De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Escover, John)
December 22, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Secretary of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibits 1-3)(Girvin, Ralph)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING without Prejudice Defendants' #13 Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
December 12, 2017 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Secretary of Health and Human Services amending, filed by Maria De La Rosa.(Escover, John)
December 5, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Secretary of Health and Human Services, Secretary of the Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1-6)(Girvin, Ralph)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the style in the case remaining before this court be modified as notedin the style utilized in this order. The clerk and the parties in this case are FURTHER ORDEREDuse the above-referenced style for all future pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Dismiss party Continental Services Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
November 24, 2017 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Continental Services Group, Inc. by Maria De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Escover, John) Modified on 11/27/2017 to clarify text (klw).
October 19, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Maria De La Rosa (Escover, John)
October 2, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE RE Service by Maria De La Rosa (Escover, John)
October 2, 2017 Filing 7 Letter from the Assistant United States Attorney regarding method of service. (jf)
September 5, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Continental Services Group, Inc..(ml)
September 1, 2017 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maria De La Rosa. (Escover, John)
August 29, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Secretary of Health and Human Services, Secretary of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (afd)
August 29, 2017 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to John Escover re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. Summons not issued to "Conserve". (afd)
August 28, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
August 28, 2017 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maria De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons)(Escover, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd).
August 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9922259), filed by Maria De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Escover, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Rosa v. Secretary of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Ralph Elwood Girvin, Jr.
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Of The Treasury
Represented By: Ralph Elwood Girvin, Jr.
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ariel Nicole Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de la Rosa
Represented By: John W. Escover
Represented By: John William Escover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?