Wiper et al v Johnson and Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Travis Wiper, Kassi P. Marks, Emily Wiper and Bradley Leger
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02650
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 10 AMENDED ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc., filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen)
August 30, 2018 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Travis Wiper. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leger, Bradley)
August 30, 2018 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Travis Wiper on August 9, 2018 re: Plaintiff's Original Complaint, filed.(Leger, Bradley)
August 30, 2018 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Travis Wiper on August 9, 2018 re: Plaintiff's Original Complaint, filed.(Leger, Bradley)
August 29, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Travis Wiper, filed.(Leger, Bradley)
August 29, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen)
August 29, 2018 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc., filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen)
August 3, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hcarr, 4)
August 2, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
August 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20576756) filed by Travis Wiper, Emily Wiper. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Johnson & Johnson, #2 Summons - Ethicon, inc.)(Leger, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiper et al v Johnson and Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Wiper
Represented By: Bradley Landon Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassi P. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Wiper
Represented By: Bradley Landon Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen A Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?