Jin v. Applied Optoelectronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lei Jin
Defendant: Applied Optoelectronics, Inc., Alex Ignatie, Richard B Black, Stefan J. Murry, Che-Wei Lin, Chih-Hsiang Thompson Lin, William H Yeh, Min-Chu Chen and Alan Moore
Case Number: 4:2018cv02713
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Fort Bend
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY on #16 Stipulation, Case stayed, Deadlines terminated (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION re: to Stay Derivative Action by Applied Optoelectronics, Inc., Richard B Black, Min-Chu Chen, Alex Ignatie, Che-Wei Lin, Chih-Hsiang Thompson Lin, Alan Moore, Stefan J. Murry, William H Yeh, filed.(Johnston, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. (Answer or Other Response due by 9/27/2018. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/27/2018.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION re: Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Responsively Plead by Applied Optoelectronics, Inc., Richard B Black, Min-Chu Chen, Alex Ignatie, Che-Wei Lin, Chih-Hsiang Thompson Lin, Alan Moore, Stefan J. Murry, William H Yeh, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnston, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Che-Wei Lin served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to William H Yeh served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Stefan J. Murry served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Richard B Black served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Min-Chu Chen served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Chih-Hsiang Thompson Lin served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex Ignatie served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alan Moore served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Applied Optoelectronics, Inc. served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lei Jin, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to Applied Optoelectronics, Inc., Richard B Black, Min-Chu Chen, Alex Ignatie, Che-Wei Lin, Chih-Hsiang Thompson Lin, Alan Moore, Stefan J. Murry, William H Yeh. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement summons, #2 Supplement summons, #3 Supplement summons, #4 Supplement summons, #5 Supplement summons, #6 Supplement summons, #7 Supplement summons, #8 Supplement summons)(Gresham, R.)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20610631) filed by Lei Jin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gresham, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jin v. Applied Optoelectronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Optoelectronics, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Ignatie
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B Black
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan J. Murry
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Che-Wei Lin
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chih-Hsiang Thompson Lin
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Yeh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Min-Chu Chen
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey S Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lei Jin
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?