Cardenas v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Antonio Cardenas
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02827
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion to Dismiss by Antonio Cardenas, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeFrancisco, Jenny)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quicken Loans, Inc., filed.(Barger, Darrell)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Quicken Loans, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2018. (Barger, Darrell)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Quicken Loans, Inc. served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018, filed.(DeFrancisco, Jenny)
August 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Quicken Loans, Inc., filed.(DeFrancisco, Jenny)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Antonio Cardenas, filed.(DeFrancisco, Jenny)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quicken Loans, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20679100) filed by Antonio Cardenas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeFrancisco, Jenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Cardenas
Represented By: Jenny Diane DeFrancisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?