Ther & Company, LLC v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ther & Company, LLC
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for ABFC 2006-HE1 Trust, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02916
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Shiels, Nicola)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ther & Company, LLC, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Shiels, Nicola)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 11/16/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT In A Removed Case re: #6 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Shiels, Nicola)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Mowrey on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for ABFC 2006-HE1 Trust, filed. (Mowrey, Robert)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Ther & Company, LLC, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur E. Anthony on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for ABFC 2006-HE1 Trust, filed. (Anthony, Arthur)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for ABFC 2006-HE1 Trust identifying U.S. Bancorp; Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Shiels, Nicola)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th Judicial District, Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-44183 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20725526) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for ABFC 2006-HE1 Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Ex B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of Counsel of Record, #4 Exhibit D - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit D-1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition & Civil Case Information Sheet, #6 Exhibit D-2 - Civil Process Request, #7 Exhibit D-3 - Civil Process Pick-Up Form, #8 Exhibit D-4 - Affidavit of Service - US Bank, NA, #9 Exhibit D-5 - Affidavit of Service - Ocwen, #10 Exhibit D-6 - Defendants' Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #11 Exhibit E - Harris County Appraisal District Property Information)(Shiels, Nicola)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ther & Company, LLC v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ther & Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for ABFC 2006-HE1 Trust
Represented By: Nicola Marie Shiels
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Arthur E Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nicola Marie Shiels
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Arthur E Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nicola Marie Shiels
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Arthur E Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?