McDonald v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Richard Ray McDonald
Defendant: K'Shawn Burwell and Ed Gonzalez
Case Number: 4:2018cv02936
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Richard McDonald re: Amending Complaint, filed. (dperez, 3)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Richard Ray McDonald re: Amending Complaint, filed. (dperez, 3)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Order re: access to law library by Richard Ray McDonald, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2018. (dperez, 3)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlson, 4)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard Ray McDonald, filed. (JenniferOlson, 4)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Richard Ray McDonald, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2018. (JenniferOlson, 4)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against K'Shawn Burwell, Ed Gonzalez (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Richard Ray McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JenniferOlson, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ray McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K'Shawn Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?