Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care v. Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 4:2018cv02946
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of C. Trey Scott, filed.(Scott, Calvin)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #2 motion for preliminary injunction. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 9/17/2018. Argument heard on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #2 ). The Court transforms the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order into a request for an injunction, because the proceedings are no longer ex parte. The Court GRANTS the Motion for the reasons stated on the record. The Court enters an injunction halting recoupment until further order from the Court. The Court DENIES the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #10 ), for the reasons stated on the record. Appearances:Nicole Ward, Joanna Martin. Jose Vela, Jr, Rama T Lagadapati, Edmond D Anderson, Calvin Trey Scott.(Court Reporter: M. Malone)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Trey Scott on behalf of Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care, filed. (Scott, Calvin)
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Setting as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kennedy, Mark)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Edmond Dante Anderson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Rama T. Lagadapati to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 9/7/2018. Argument heard on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #2 ). The Court takes the Motion under advisement. Appearances:Joanna Martin, Rama Lagadapati, Nicole Ward. Jose Vela, Jr, Mark Stephen Kennedy.(Court Reporter: L. Wells)(Law Clerk: L. Scaduto), filed.(arrivera, 4)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Edmond Dante Anderson III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2018. (Vela, Jose)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Rama T. Lagadapati to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2018. (Vela, Jose)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 ADVISORY by Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kennedy, Mark)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna H. Martin on behalf of Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care, filed. (Kennedy, Mark)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Setting as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
August 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Errata)(Kennedy, Mark)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Mark)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20739779) filed by Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care v. Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Han Ma Eum, Inc. d/b/a Coastal Home Health Care
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Represented By: Calvin Trey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Represented By: Rama T Lagadapati
Represented By: Edmond D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?