UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2132 COUNTRY CLUB DRIVE, PEARLAND, TEXAS

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2132 COUNTRY CLUB DRIVE, PEARLAND, TEXAS and Mrs Laila nmn Bataineh
Case Number: 4:2018cv03028
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN of Service Executed as to Post and Walk on September 4, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of Service Executed as to Occupants on September 4, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of Service Executed as to Laila Bataineh on September 4, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of Service Executed as to Mohammad Bataineh on September 26, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Claim by Laila nmn Bataineh, filed. (Duke, Charles)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 CLAIM filed by Laila nmn Bataineh.(Duke, Charles)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Laila nmn Bataineh, filed.(Duke, Charles)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H Miller for the following reason: Agreement between the judges. Related case: H-16-cr-170. Judge Alfred H Bennett no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2132 COUNTRY CLUB DRIVE, PEARLAND, TEXAS filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Roth, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2132 COUNTRY CLUB DRIVE, PEARLAND, TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2132 COUNTRY CLUB DRIVE, PEARLAND, TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Laila nmn Bataineh
Represented By: Charles L Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Vincent Carroll
Represented By: Lori Silverstein Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?