Peters v. U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee
Plaintiff: Tammy Peters
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Legal Title Trustee
3Rd Party Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
3Rd Party Defendant: Marshall Alexander Smith, Kahleel Peters, Unknown Heirs-At-Law of Roosevelt Smith, Jr. and Trevin Louis Peters
Case Number: 4:2018cv03110
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Summons Issued as to Kahleel Peters, Trevin Louis Peters, Marshall Alexander Smith. Issued summons delivered to requestor by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kahleel Peters, Trevin Louis Peters, Marshall Alexander Smith, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Danaher, Philip)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Kahleel Peters, Trevin Louis Peters, Marshall Alexander Smith, Unknown Heirs-At-Law of Roosevelt Smith, Jr. filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust.(Danaher, Philip)
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 Amended Counterclaim and THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tammy Peters, Unknown Heirs-At-Law of Roosevelt Smith, Jr., Marshall Alexander Smith, Trevin Louis Peters, Kahleel Peters, filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust.(ghassan, 4)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on Leave. US Bank may amend its counterclaim and third-party complaint #12 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Management ORDER. By 10/12/2018, US Bank must file its return of service on Roosevelt Smith, Jr. Celena Pawlak's motion to withdraw as counsel is accepted. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: Samin Hessami. Ct Reporter: J. Sanchez. The court called plaintiff's counsel, Celena Pawlak. Ms. Pawlak orally moved to withdraw as counsel. Internal review set for 11/5/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samin Hessami on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association, as Legal Title Trustee, filed. (Danaher, Philip)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Their Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by U.S. Bank, National Association, as Legal Title Trustee, filed. (Danaher, Philip)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Celena Pawlak as to Tammy Peters re: #5 Notice in a Removed or Transferred Case - FORM - Hughes, filed. (nortiz, 5)
September 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to Roosevelt Smith, Jr.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail.(rguerrero, 4)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2018 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Roosevelt Smith, Jr., filed.(Danaher, Philip)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Roosevelt Smith, Jr. filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, as Legal Title Trustee.(Danaher, Philip)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank, National Association, as Legal Title Trustee, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-51797 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20801427) filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, as Legal Title Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Legal Title Trustee
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Peters
Represented By: Celena Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Philip W Danaher
Represented By: Samin Hessami
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Marshall Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kahleel Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Unknown Heirs-At-Law of Roosevelt Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Trevin Louis Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?