White et al v. CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James White and Merri White
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC and The Village at Gleannloch Farms
Case Number: 4:2018cv03189
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiffs James White and Merri White, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Stephen P. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC, filed.(Baggett, Phillip)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC, filed.(Baggett, Phillip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Stephen P Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James White, Merri White, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2018. (mxperez, 5)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Baggett on behalf of Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC, The Village at Gleannloch Farms, filed. (Baggett, Phillip)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Amended Notice of Removal by Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Linberg, Pamela)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2018-47978 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20831173) filed by Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Linberg, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Banks Linberg
Represented By: Phillip Adam Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCRC OpCo-Gleannloch Farms, LLC
Represented By: Pamela Banks Linberg
Represented By: Phillip Adam Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village at Gleannloch Farms
Represented By: Phillip Adam Baggett
Represented By: Pamela Banks Linberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Stephen P Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merri White
Represented By: Stephen P Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?