Davis v. Gardener et al
Plaintiff: Cora Davis
Defendant: Neil Richard Gardener, Dick Gardner d/b/a Gardner Trucking and Dick Gardner
Case Number: 4:2018cv03267
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Neil Richard Gardener, filed.(Ramey, Robert)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cora Davis, filed.(Davis, Joshua)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT Concerning Removal re: #5 Order to Show Cause Concerning Removal - Judge Gilmore by Neil Richard Gardener, filed.(Ramey, Robert)
September 20, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U. S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate is available by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, filed. (bthomas, 4)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause Concerning Removal.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Neil Richard Gardener, filed.(Ramey, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th District Court - Colorado County, case number 25074 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20870118) filed by Dick Gardner d/b/a Gardner Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ramey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Gardener et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Richard Gardener
Represented By: Robert Langdon Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Gardner d/b/a Gardner Trucking
Represented By: Robert Langdon Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Gardner
Represented By: Robert Langdon Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Davis
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Represented By: Katherine Mary James Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?