Yuen v. Triple B Services, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Trustee Xenos Yuen
Defendant: ASHLAR DEVELOPMENT, LLC, BIG R TRUCKING, LLC, RAUL BARBA, JR, TRIPLE B SERVICES, LLP, J MARTINEZ TRUCKING, Juan Luis BARBA, Gilberto Luis, Esteban Requena, d/b/a/ Transport Requena A, All Road Transport, LLC, Pedro Amaya, d/b/a Sante Fe Trucking, Danny Arjona, John Doe Truck Drivers 1-100, MTZ Trucking, Inc., David Vela, Raul Barba, Jr. and Bruno R Luis
Case Number: 4:2018cv03277
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:9613
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Complaint by Danny Arjona, Juan Luis Barba, Raul Barba, Jr, J Martinez Trucking, Esteban Requena, d/b/a/ Transport Requena A, David Vela, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Castillo, Jesse)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim by Triple B Services, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rycroft, Breton)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time Defendant, Triple B Services, LLP's deadline to File its Original Answer is extended until November 16, 2018..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Melanie A. Castillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danny Arjona, Juan Luis Barba, Raul Barba, Jr, J Martinez Trucking, Bruno R Luis, Esteban Requena, d/b/a/ Transport Requena A, David Vela, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2018. (Castillo, Jesse)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Jesse R. Castillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danny Arjona, Juan Luis Barba, Raul Barba, Jr, J Martinez Trucking, Bruno R Luis, Esteban Requena, d/b/a/ Transport Requena A, David Vela, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2018. (Castillo, Jesse)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant Bruno R. Luis and Gilberto Luis Individiually ORIGINAL ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Bruno R Luis, Gilberto Luis, filed.(olindor, 4)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Complaint by Triple B Services, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Walker, William)
October 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to Ashlar Development, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ashlar Development, LLC, filed.(Barrett, Kenneth)
October 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to Gilberto Luis. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Gilberto Luis, filed.(Barrett, Kenneth)
October 11, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Road Transport, LLC, Pedro Amaya, d/b/a Sante Fe Trucking, Danny Arjona, Ashlar Development, LLC, Juan Luis Barba, Raul Barba, Jr, Big R Trucking, LLC, J Martinez Trucking, Bruno R Luis, MTZ Trucking, Inc., Esteban Requena, d/b/a/ Transport Requena A, Triple B Services, LLP, David Vela. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Barrett, Kenneth)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Xenos Yuen, filed.(Barrett, Kenneth)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Xenos Yuen.(Barrett, Kenneth)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
September 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20881787) filed by Xenos Yuen.(Barrett, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuen v. Triple B Services, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLAR DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG R TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAUL BARBA, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIPLE B SERVICES, LLP
Represented By: Breton Alejandro Rycroft
Represented By: William Jason Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J MARTINEZ TRUCKING
Represented By: Jesse R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Luis BARBA
Represented By: Jesse R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Luis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esteban Requena, d/b/a/ Transport Requena A
Represented By: Jesse R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Road Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Amaya, d/b/a Sante Fe Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Arjona
Represented By: Jesse R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Truck Drivers 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTZ Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Vela
Represented By: Jesse R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Barba, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruno R Luis
Represented By: Jesse R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Xenos Yuen
Represented By: Byron A Hamilton, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Royce Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?