Harrison v. HARRIS COUNTY JAIL

Plaintiff: Perry Harrison
Defendant: HARRIS COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 4:2018cv03282
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Partial Filing fee: $9.00 re: #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, receipt number HOU084291, filed. (koradiegwu, 4)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HARRIS COUNTY JAIL, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2018. (hler, 4)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT of Facts by Perry Harrison, filed.(hler, 4)
October 16, 2018 Partial PLRA Filing fee: $6.00, receipt number HOU083682, filed. (jsuchma, 4)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Perry Harrison, filed. (bmendoza, 5)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Perry Harrison, filed. (agould, 3)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Perry Harrison, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2018. (agould, 3)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against HARRIS COUNTY JAIL (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Perry Harrison.(agould, 3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Envelope) (agould, 3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. HARRIS COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIS COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?