UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $222,200.00 United States Currency

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $222,200.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Claimant: Estate of Roddrick Faulkner
Case Number: 4:2018cv03290
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 12 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with JURY DEMAND by Estate of Roddrick Faulkner, filed.(Gray, Stephen)
October 24, 2018 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued, filed. (gclair, 4)
October 15, 2018 11 Verified STATEMENT of Claim by Estate of Roddrick Faulkner, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Issuance of Warrant.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Stephen Gerald Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 1, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Gerald Gray on behalf of Estate of Roddrick Faulkner, filed. (dperez, 3)
October 1, 2018 7 MOTION for Stephen Gerald Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice by $222,200.00 United States Currency, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2018. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 1, 2018 6 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carroll, Eric)
September 27, 2018 5 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #2 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Carroll, Eric)
September 20, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Carroll, Eric)
September 19, 2018 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Carroll, Eric)
September 14, 2018 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against $222,200.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Carroll, Eric)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against $222,200.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Carroll, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $222,200.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $222,200.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Stephen Gerald Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Vincent Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Roddrick Faulkner
Represented By: Stephen Gerald Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?