Cline et al v. Hennes & Mauritz AB

Plaintiff: Leahann Cline, Nik Cline and Dylan Anderson
Defendant: Hennes & Mauritz AB
Case Number: 4:2018cv03301
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Andrew Satenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 11, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Jeffrey E Fields to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 10, 2018 6 MOTION for Jeffrey E. Fields and Andrew Satenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hennes & Mauritz AB, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Cheairs, Melanie)
October 10, 2018 5 MOTION for Jeffrey E. Fields and Andrew Satenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hennes & Mauritz AB, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2018. (Cheairs, Melanie)
October 2, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dylan Anderson, Leahann Cline, Nik Cline, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso)
September 17, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 14, 2018 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Hennes & Mauritz AB sent on 9/14/2018 by Dylan Anderson, Nik Cline, Leahann Cline, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hennes & Mauritz AB (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20880653) filed by Dylan Anderson, Nik Cline, Leahann Cline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennard, Alfonso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline et al v. Hennes & Mauritz AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leahann Cline
Represented By: Alfonso Kennard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nik Cline
Represented By: Alfonso Kennard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Anderson
Represented By: Alfonso Kennard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennes & Mauritz AB
Represented By: Andrew Satenberg
Represented By: Jeffrey E Fields
Represented By: Melanie R Cheairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?