Bernal et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1 et al

Plaintiff: Rebecca Bernal and Ignacio Bernal
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1
Case Number: 4:2018cv03303
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany S. Gilbert and Gregory Brewer on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, filed. (Serbousek Gilbert, Tiffany)
October 16, 2018 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Ignacio Bernal, Rebecca Bernal, filed.(Gordon, Joshua)
October 16, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ignacio Bernal, Rebecca Bernal, filed.(Gordon, Joshua)
October 16, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, filed.(Shirazi, Sahar)
October 3, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daron L. Janis on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, filed. (Janis, Daron)
October 3, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Yoxall on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, filed. (Yoxall, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 11/16/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
September 27, 2018 3 STATEMENT in a Removed Case re: #2 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, filed.(Shirazi, Sahar)
September 17, 2018 2 Featured Case Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2018-51937 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20880561) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit E)(Shirazi, Sahar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernal et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Bernal
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Bernal
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Represented By: Daron L Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Represented By: Daron L Janis
Represented By: Tiffany Serbousek Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?