Stellges v. Bison Recovery Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Matthew Stellges
Defendant: Bison Recovery Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03304
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 Summons Issued as to Bison Recovery Group, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
October 1, 2018 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bison Recovery Group, Inc., filed.(Jaffer, Shawn)
September 19, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matthew Stellges, filed.(Jaffer, Shawn)
September 17, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bison Recovery Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20880919) filed by Matthew Stellges. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stellges v. Bison Recovery Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Stellges
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bison Recovery Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?