Coleman v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles B Coleman
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. as Successor to Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, ("MERS"), Coutntrywide Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a America's Wholesale Lender and The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for Securitized Trust CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-6 Trust
Case Number: 4:2018cv03376
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed.(Hord, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., filed.(Hord, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bank of America N.A. as Successor to Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Coutntrywide Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a America's Wholesale Lender, filed.(Alexander, Tatiana)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Finman, Tzvi)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Defendants' Compliance with Court's Order in Removed Cases by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, ("MERS"), Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for Securitized Trust CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-6 Trust, filed.(Hord, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, ("MERS"), The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for Securitized Trust CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-6 Trust, filed.(Hord, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 11/16/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, ("MERS"), Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for Securitized Trust CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-6 Trust, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hord, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 CONSENT to Removal by Bank of America N.A. as Successor to Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Coutntrywide Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a America's Wholesale Lender, filed.(Hord, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 268th District Court, case number 18-DCV-254348 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20926493) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C1 - part 1, #5 Exhibit C1 - part 2, #6 Exhibit C1 - part 3, #7 Exhibit C2, #8 Exhibit C3, #9 Exhibit C4, #10 Exhibit C5, #11 Exhibit C6, #12 Exhibit C7, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. as Successor to Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, ("MERS")
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coutntrywide Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a America's Wholesale Lender
Represented By: Tatiana Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for Securitized Trust CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-6 Trust
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B Coleman
Represented By: Tzvi Aryea Finman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?