Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. et al v. Pacific Link et al

Plaintiff: Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. and Goodman Company, L.P.
Defendant: Pacific Link and Wenzhou Qicheng Distribution Electrical Equipment Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03499
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pacific Link served on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018, filed.(Raffetto, Mary)
October 16, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Goodman Company, L.P., Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P., filed.(Beck, David)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
September 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20976023) filed by Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P., Goodman Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Beck, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. et al v. Pacific Link et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P.
Represented By: David J Beck
Represented By: Mary Kate Raffetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodman Company, L.P.
Represented By: David J Beck
Represented By: Mary Kate Raffetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenzhou Qicheng Distribution Electrical Equipment Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?