Glassman et al v. Roe-Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Craig Whiting, Elizabeth Glassman, Jesse Glassman and Julie Whiting
Defendant: Kim Rogers-Porter, Heather Vaughn, Aaron Fincham, Brenda Lara, Whalenniel Grant-Billy, Sandra Westcott, Patti Sexton, Rebecca Girardet and Kim Roe-Anderson
Case Number: 4:2018cv03521
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Compliance by Elizabeth Glassman, filed. (Tipsword, Geric)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand to State Court by Elizabeth Glassman, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2018. (Tipsword, Geric)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Geric LaVerle Tipsword as to Elizabeth Glassman re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. Ryman on behalf of Aaron Fincham, Whalenniel Grant-Billy, Brenda Lara, Kim Roe-Anderson, Kim Rogers-Porter, filed. (Ryman, Shannon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. Ryman on behalf of Aaron Fincham, Whalenniel Grant-Billy, Brenda Lara, Kim Roe-Anderson, Kim Rogers-Porter, filed. (Ryman, Shannon)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Geric LaVerle Tipsword as to Jesse Glassman re: #10 Order,, filed. (srussell, 2)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rebecca Girardet, filed.(Strawn, John)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Shannon Ryman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING without prejudice, pending compliance with this Order #5 MOTION for Geric Tipsword to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 MOTION for Geric Tipswpord to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Shannon M. Ryman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Fincham, Whalenniel Grant-Billy, Brenda Lara, Kim Roe-Anderson, Kim Rogers-Porter, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Patterson, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Geric Tipswpord to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Glassman, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Quezada, Yahaira)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Patti Sexton, Heather Vaughn, Sandra Westcott, filed.(Miller, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aaron Fincham, Whalenniel Grant-Billy, Brenda Lara, Kim Roe-Anderson, Kim Rogers-Porter, filed.(Patterson, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Geric Tipsword to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Glassman, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2018. (Quezada, Yahaira)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Rebecca Girardet, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Rebecca Girardet, M.D.s Motion To Dismiss)(Strawn, John)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aaron Fincham, Whalenniel Grant-Billy, Brenda Lara, Kim Roe-Anderson, Kim Rogers-Porter, filed.(Patterson, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 284th District Court, Montgomery County, TX, case number 18-08-11048 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20993865) filed by Brenda Lara, Aaron Fincham, Kim Roe-Anderson, Kim Rogers-Porter, Whalenniel Grant-Billy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Original petition, #3 Exhibit Executed Citations Combined, #4 Exhibit Defs Vaugh, Westcott, Sexton's Original Answer, #5 Exhibit Defs Vaugh, Westcott, Sexton's Application for Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit Def Original Answer w General Denial PTJ, #7 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #8 Exhibit List of Parties, #9 Exhibit js044 civil cover sheet)(Patterson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glassman et al v. Roe-Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Whiting
Represented By: Geric LaVerle Tipsword
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Glassman
Represented By: Geric LaVerle Tipsword
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Glassman
Represented By: Geric LaVerle Tipsword
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Whiting
Represented By: Geric LaVerle Tipsword
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Rogers-Porter
Represented By: Michael J Patterson
Represented By: Shannon Michelle Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Vaughn
Represented By: David L Miller
Represented By: Diane Freeman Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Fincham
Represented By: Michael J Patterson
Represented By: Shannon Michelle Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Lara
Represented By: Michael J Patterson
Represented By: Shannon Michelle Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whalenniel Grant-Billy
Represented By: Michael J Patterson
Represented By: Shannon Michelle Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Westcott
Represented By: David L Miller
Represented By: Diane Freeman Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Sexton
Represented By: David L Miller
Represented By: Diane Freeman Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Girardet
Represented By: John R Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Roe-Anderson
Represented By: Michael J Patterson
Represented By: Shannon Michelle Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?