Marlon et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Oliveira Florinda Marlon, Eden Marlon and Ezio Marlon
Defendant: Nanette Y Marlon, Mara Fiessen, Steve Roddy, Greg Abbott, C Velez and Texas Attorney General Child Support Division
Case Number: 4:2018cv03555
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #7 Complaint by Greg Abbott, Mara Fiessen, Steve Roddy, Texas Attorney General Child Support Division, C Velez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Christine)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice and MOTION for Sanctions ( Motion Docket Date 12/4/2018.), by Nanette Y Marlon, filed. (olindor, 4)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 DUE NOTICE of no contact contract by Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed.(JenniferOlson, 4)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 DUE NOTICE / Judicial Notice by Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed.(JenniferOlson, 4)
October 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, Mara Fiessen, Nanette Y Marlon, Steve Roddy, C Velez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(thanniable, 4)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Civil Cover Sheet by Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon, Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed.(thanniable, 4)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Service Color of Law Form by Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 Due Notice by Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon, Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed.(gkelner, 4)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Oliveira Florinda Marlon, Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon. (Attachments: #1 Constitution)(gkelner, 4)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
October 2, 2018 Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Due Notice of Estoppel Motion to Intervene with Permanent Injunction, receipt number HOU083407, filed. (gclair, 4)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Due NOTICE of #1 Due Notice of Estoppel Motion to Intervene with Permanent Injunction, by Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon, Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed. (gclair, 4)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Judicial NOTICE of Adjudicative Fact by Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon, Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed. (gclair, 4)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Objection Federal Rules of Evidence by Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon, Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed. (gclair, 4)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE and Affidavit of Facts by Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon, Oliveira Florinda Marlon, filed. (gclair, 4)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 Due Notice of Estoppel Motion to Intervene with Permanent Injunction against All Defendants filed by Oliveira Florinda Marlon, Eden Marlon, Ezio Marlon. (Attachments: #1 Continuation 1, #2 Continuation 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(gclair, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlon et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanette Y Marlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mara Fiessen
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Roddy
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Velez
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Attorney General Child Support Division
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliveira Florinda Marlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Marlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezio Marlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?