Simpson et al v. U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Plaintiff: Kelysia A. Simpson and Charlie W. Jones, Jr.
Defendant: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Case Number: 4:2018cv03602
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER [RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER], filed.(Overbey, Jeremy)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, filed.(Overbey, Jeremy)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, filed.(Overbey, Jeremy)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 11/16/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kelysia A. Simpson re: #2 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller, filed. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable re: #2 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller, filed. (AdrianDeLaRosa, 7)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT CONCERNING REMOVAL by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, filed.(Overbey, Jeremy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,,, by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F-1 [EXHIBIT TO DECLARATION OF J. ALLEN SMITH] - Harris County Appraisal District Printout)(Overbey, Jeremy)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 165th Judicial District Court of Harris County, TX, case number 201859727 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21018318) filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A : Index, #2 Exhibit B : State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C-1 : Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #4 Exhibit C-2 : Civil Case Information Sheet, #5 Exhibit C-3 : Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs, #6 Exhibit C-4 : Defendant's Original Answer, #7 Exhibit D : Counsel of Record, #8 Exhibit E: Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #9 Exhibit F : Declaration of Jeremy Overbey, #10 Exhibit F-1 : Harris County Appraisal District Valuation, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelysia A. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie W. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: J Allen Smith
Represented By: Jeremy Jason Overbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?