Confident Care Home Health, Inc. v. Azar
Plaintiff: Confident Care Home Health, Inc.
Defendant: Secretary Alex M Azar
Case Number: 4:2018cv03604
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Kermit R. Williams, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Kermit R. Williams, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex M Azar, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Vela, Jose)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Status Conference ( Status Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake). (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Status Conference by Alex M Azar, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ( Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018.) by Alex M Azar, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Edmond Dante Anderson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Edmond Dante Anderson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex M Azar, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Vela, Jose)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Confident Care Home Health, Inc. (Status Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex M Azar served on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Confident Care Home Health, Inc., filed.(Kennedy, Mark)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alex M Azar, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Confident Care Home Health, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Mark)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21019391) filed by Confident Care Home Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Confident Care Home Health, Inc. v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M Azar
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Represented By: Edmond D Anderson
Represented By: Kermit R Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confident Care Home Health, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?