Castillo v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Plaintiff: Bernardino Castillo
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 4:2018cv03787
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER Transferring Case. This case is transferred to the Galveston Division of the Southern District of Texas #3 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 18, 2018 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to Galveston Division by Bernardino Castillo, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pandit, Rajan)
October 15, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21068277) filed by Bernardino Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Declaration Page)(Pandit, Rajan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardino Castillo
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?