Jayla Allen et al v. Waller County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Treasure Smith, Raul Sanchez, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad and Jayla Allen
Defendant: Carbett Duhon, Waller County Commissioners Court, Waller County, Texas and Christy Eason
Case Number: 4:2018cv03985
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Elton R Mathis as to Waller County Commissioners Court re: #31 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (bmendoza, 5)
December 14, 2018 Filing 32 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Elton R Mathis as to Waller County Commissioners Court re: #30 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Deuel Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs'Original Complaint on or before January, 7, 2019.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 5, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Responsive Pleading by Carbett Duhon, Christy Eason, Waller County Commissioners Court, Waller County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seaquist, Gunnar)
December 5, 2018 Filing 28 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Carbett Duhon served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 27 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Christy Eason served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 26 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Waller County Commissioners Court served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 25 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Waller County, Texas served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Kristen A. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
October 29, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jayla Allen, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad, Raul Sanchez, Treasure Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Julie)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leah C. Aden to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Elizabeth Dorsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Elton R. Mathis to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Catherine Meza to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jayla Allen, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad, Raul Sanchez, Treasure Smith, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Leah C. Aden, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Harrison, Julie)
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jayla Allen, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad, Raul Sanchez, Treasure Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Julie)
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Elizabeth Dorsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carbett Duhon, Christy Eason, Waller County Commissioners Court, Waller County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2018. (Seaquist, Gunnar)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Elton R. Mathis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carbett Duhon, Christy Eason, Waller County Commissioners Court, Waller County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2018. (Seaquist, Gunnar)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Robert Heath and Gunnar P. Seaquist on behalf of Carbett Duhon, Christy Eason, Waller County Commissioners Court, Waller County, Texas, filed. (Seaquist, Gunnar)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Gray H Miller recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(MarcelleLaBee, 4)
October 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Carbett Duhon, Christy Eason, Waller County Commissioners Court, Waller County, Texas. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Carbett Duhon, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Christy Eason, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Waller County Commissioners Court, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Waller County, Texas, filed.(Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Kristen Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jayla Allen, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad, Raul Sanchez, Treasure Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Catherine Meza to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jayla Allen, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad, Raul Sanchez, Treasure Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Deuel Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jayla Allen, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad, Raul Sanchez, Treasure Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leah C. Aden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jayla Allen, Damon Johnson, Joshua Muhammad, Raul Sanchez, Treasure Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Harrison, Julie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21131361) filed by Raul Sanchez, Jayla Allen, Joshua Muhammad, Damon Johnson, Treasure Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unredacted attachment Civil Cover Sheet - Attachment A, #3 Unredacted attachment Civil Cover Sheet - Attachment B)(Harrison, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jayla Allen et al v. Waller County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbett Duhon
Represented By: Elton R Mathis
Represented By: Gunnar Peterson Seaquist
Represented By: Elizabeth Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waller County Commissioners Court
Represented By: Elton R Mathis
Represented By: Gunnar Peterson Seaquist
Represented By: Elizabeth Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waller County, Texas
Represented By: Elton R Mathis
Represented By: Gunnar Peterson Seaquist
Represented By: Elizabeth Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Eason
Represented By: Elton R Mathis
Represented By: Gunnar Peterson Seaquist
Represented By: Elizabeth Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treasure Smith
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kristen A Johnson
Represented By: Leah Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Sanchez
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kristen A Johnson
Represented By: Leah Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Johnson
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kristen A Johnson
Represented By: Leah Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Muhammad
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kristen A Johnson
Represented By: Leah Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayla Allen
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kristen A Johnson
Represented By: Leah Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?