Gibbs v. City Of Houston

Plaintiff: Kristen Gibbs
Defendant: City Of Houston
Case Number: 4:2018cv04278
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to City Of Houston. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kristen Gibbs, filed.(Sprovach, Ellen)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2019 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of Houston (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21258395) filed by Kristen Gibbs.(Sprovach, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. City Of Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Gibbs
Represented By: Ellen Sprovach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?