Schonert v. Turner Industries Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lenard Schonert
Defendant: Turner Industries Group, LLC and Occupational Medical Care
Case Number: 4:2018cv04305
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on November 26, 2018 (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Lenard Schonert, filed. (Jones, DaSean)
November 15, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Jones, DaSean)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21272282) filed by Lenard Schonert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Jones, DaSean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schonert v. Turner Industries Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupational Medical Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenard Schonert
Represented By: DaSean A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?