Henry v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antwan Henry
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC (f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC), Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv04414
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Ditech Financial LLC, filed.(Smith, Sam)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/15/2019. Responses due by 3/8/2019. Replies due by 3/19/2019.), Deadlines terminated (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for Registered Holders of the CWABS, Inc. Assest-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-5), filed.(Summers, Monica)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to File to File ECF Certification under Local Rule 7.1 (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Antwan Henry. (SarahShelby, 4)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File to File ECF Certification under Local Rule 7.1 by Antwan Henry, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/18/2019. (SarahShelby, 4)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Ginny E. Webb to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Webb terminated (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Summers on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for Registered Holders of the CWABS, Inc. Assest-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-5), filed. (Summers, Monica)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Ginny E. Webb to Withdraw as Attorney by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for Registered Holders of the CWABS, Inc. Assest-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-5), filed. Motion Docket Date 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Townsend, C)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for Registered Holders of the CWABS, Inc. Assest-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-5), filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McInnis, Walter)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ditech Financial LLC, filed.(Smith, Sam)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Ditech Financial LLC, filed.(Smith, Sam)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Disregard - See #4 Order - Modified on 11/21/2018 (aboyd, 4).
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 80th Judicial District, Harris County, TX, case number 2018-74113 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21315307) filed by Ditech Financial LLC (f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-part1, #2 Exhibit A-part2, #3 Exhibit A-part3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC (f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC)
Represented By: Sam David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Webb
Represented By: Monica Lizette Summers
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Webb
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Represented By: Monica Lizette Summers
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Melissa Sue Gutierrez
Represented By: Sam David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?