Holland v. Weisfelner
Plaintiff: John Bruce Holland
Defendant: Edward S Weisfelner
Case Number: 4:2018cv04461
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Additional Remedies by John Bruce Holland, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2019. (dnoriega, 1)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Bruce Holland, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
November 27, 2018 Full Filing Civil fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU084516, filed. (jguajardo, 4)
November 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to Edward S Weisfelner. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edward S Weisfelner filed by John Bruce Holland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hler, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Weisfelner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S Weisfelner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bruce Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?