Pickney v. Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Pickney
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Services Limited, Diamond Offshore Drilling Inc and ABC Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 4:2018cv04545
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/12/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 6/14/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 7/26/2019. Discovery due by 9/20/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/4/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2019. Docket Call set for 11/8/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference held. Appearances: Jennifer Lynn Anderson, Scott David Newar. Ct Reporter: L. Wells. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. (Initial Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake), Motions terminated: #18 Motion for Continuance (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Continuance of Rule 16(b) Conference by Raymond Pickney, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/22/2019. (Newar, Scott)
January 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Notice of Substitution of Scott Newar as Plaintiff's Counsel by Raymond Pickney, filed. (Newar, Scott)
December 24, 2018 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Diamond Offshore Drilling Inc, Diamond Offshore Services Limited, filed.(Anderson, Jennifer)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Diamond Offshore Drilling Inc, Diamond Offshore Services Limited, filed.(Anderson, Jennifer)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Diamond Offshore Drilling Inc, Diamond Offshore Services Limited, filed.(Anderson, Jennifer)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Minia E. Bremenstul to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Minia E. Bremenstul to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diamond Offshore Drilling Inc, Diamond Offshore Services Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2018. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in from Louisiana Middle. Case Number 3:18-cv-00723; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: This lawsuit is hereby dismissed from the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana, and all remaining claims are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/27/2018. (LLH)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Consent Rule 12 MOTION to Transfer Federal Claims and Dismiss State Law Claims. Plaintiff's state-law racial discrimination claim under La. R.S. 23:332 and state-law direct action claim are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the remaining claims are transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/27/2018. (LLH)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc., Diamond Offshore Services Limited. (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc.. (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Consent Rule 12 MOTION to Transfer Federal Claims and Dismiss State Law Claims by Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc., Diamond Offshore Services Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Anderson, Jennifer) Modified on 11/20/2018 to edit event and text (SWE).
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendants having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 12/13/2018 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/29/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/31/2018. (LLH) Main Document 3 replaced on 8/9/2018 to correct attachment A (BLR).
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc., Diamond Offshore Services Limited. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SGO)
July 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1801380.), filed by Raymond Pickney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Most, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickney v. Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Pickney
Represented By: William Brock Most
Represented By: Scott David Newar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Services Limited
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Minia E Bremenstul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Drilling Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Minia E Bremenstul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?