Johnson v. The Lincoln National Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Laura Johnson
Defendant: The Lincoln National Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv04616
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Jason A. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
January 30, 2019 8 MOTION for Jason A. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Lincoln National Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2019. (Gutierrez, Melissa)
January 30, 2019 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Lincoln National Insurance Company, filed.(Gutierrez, Melissa)
January 30, 2019 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lincoln National Insurance Company, filed.(Gutierrez, Melissa)
January 4, 2019 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Lincoln National Insurance Company served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019, filed.(Powers, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Laura Johnson, filed.(Powers, Kevin)
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 7, 2018 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Lincoln National Insurance Company, filed.(Powers, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21421918) filed by Laura Johnson.(Powers, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. The Lincoln National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Represented By: Melissa Sue Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?