Berry v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Plaintiff: Tala Berry
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv04619
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tala Berry filed by Tala Berry.(Powells, Willie)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Designate John Doe as Responsible Third Party. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 18, 2019 10 Defendant's Mandatory Initial Discovery Requirements by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John)
January 17, 2019 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 2/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
January 17, 2019 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial 12(b)(6) by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Ramirez, John)
January 11, 2019 7 MOTION to Designate Responsible Third Party by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Leave)(Ramirez, John)
December 11, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John)
December 11, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John)
December 11, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ramirez, John)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th District Court, Harris County, case number 2018-59986 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21422328) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tala Berry
Represented By: Willie D Powells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Represented By: Neal Alexander Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?